Rigsby et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Cori Rigsby and Kerri Rigsby
Defendant: Forensic Analysis Engineering Corporation, Haag Engineering Co., Alexis King and State Farm Mutual Insurance Company
Movant: United States of America
Counter_claimant: State Farm Mutual Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: Cori Rigsby and Kerri Rigsby
Case Number: 1:2006cv00433
Filed: April 26, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: L. T. Senter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1678 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's Motion 1634 to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and denying Defendant's Motion 1632 to Dismiss Relators Cori Rigsby and Kerri Rigsby's Second Amended Complaint 1623 . Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on March 26, 2021. (ENW)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1570 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1507 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 12, 2019 (King, Steve)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1348 Motion to Compel; denying 1375 Motion for Leave to File Sur-rebuttal in Opposition to 1348 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 18, 2018 (King, Steve)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 ORDER granting Relators' 1299 Motion to Extinguish Gilbert LLP's Lien, denying Gilbert LLP's 1311 Counter-Motion to Set Value of Lien, and extinguishing Gilbert LLP's 991 Lien. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on September 27, 2017. (ENW)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1279 ORDER denying Relators' 1242 Motion to Dismiss and for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on May 27, 2016. (ENW)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Relators' 1104 Motion to Initiate Discovery, Impose Maximum Penalty, Award Maximum Relators' Share, and Award Relators Their Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Costs. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 2/21/2014. (ENW)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 904 ORDER granting 902 Motion to Lift Stay and Reinstate Case on Active Docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 12/5/11 (RLW)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 898 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 734 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 9/30/2011. (ENW)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 890 ORDER CORRECTING ERROR OF FACT CONCERNING PRIOR REPRESENTATION OF THE RELATORS IN MEMORANDUM OPINION 871 . Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 04/04/2011 (kbo)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER ORDER DENYING STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S MOTION 739 TO DISMISS FOR RELATORS' VIOLATION OF SEAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 01/24/2011 (kbo)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ORDER DENYING STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S MOTION 844 TO RECONSIDER DECISION DENYING ITS MOTIONS 300 706 TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF DAVID FAVRE. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on(kbo)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 841 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION 687 OF STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF CERTAIN WITNESSES ON THE GROUNDS OF UNTIMELY DISCLOSURE BY RELATORS. State Farm may depose these witnesses within thirty days of the date of this opinion and order. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 12/09/2010 (kbo)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER GRANTING MOTION 799 OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO DISMISS FORENSIC ANALYSIS AND ENGINEERING CORP. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 11/29/2010 (kbo)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 829 ORDER DENYING STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S SEALED MOTION 756 TO DECLASSIFY PORTIONS OF NON-PARTY REARDON GROUP'S RULE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION FROM "PROTECTED INFORMATION" STATUS UNDER THE CONSENT ORDER 406 ENTERED ON JAN UARY 27, 2010, AND GRANTING STATE FARM LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL ANY OR ALL OF THESE DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS PENDING MOTION 739 TO DISMISS. The order allows State Farm a period of ten days from the date of this order to make these submissions under seal. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 11/23/2010 (kbo)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ORDER GRANTING STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE 707 EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN A. FOWLER, P.E. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 11/18/2010 (kbo)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ORDER DENYING State Farm Insurance Company's 794 Motion for use of a supplemental questionnaire addressed to potential jurors in this action. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 10/26/2010 (kbo)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 790 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 723 MOTION OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL 713 OF FORENSIC ANALYSIS AND ENGINEERING, INC. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 10/05/2010 (kbo)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER DENYING STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S 709 MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF LOUIS G. FEY, JR. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 09/02/2010 (kbo)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER denying State Farm's 298 Motion to Exclude; denying State Farm's 715 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 08/24/2010 (kbo)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER denying State Farm's 294 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Patrick J. Fitzpatrick; denying State Farm's 296 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Keith G. Blackwell; denying State Farm's 705 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Patrick J. Fitzpatrick; denying State Farm's 719 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Keith G. Blackwell. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 08/04/2010 (kbo)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ORDER denying 665 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 13, 2010 (King, Steve)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 671 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 9, 2010 (King, Steve)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting Relators' 539 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79 Relators' Response in Objection to Haag Engineering Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 05/27/2010 (kbo)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER bifurcating the trial of these two claims, staying discovery on State Farm Insurance Company's counterclaim until the trial of the Relators' claim has been completed, and scheduling a separate trial to reach the merits of the counterc laim. United States Magistrate Judge Walker will establish a pre-trial schedule for the trial of the Relators' claim, and, after the merits of that claim have been tried, he will establish a pre-trial schedule for the counterclaim. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 09/24/2009 (kbo)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 360 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR STATE FARM'S IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF LIST OF PROPERTIES: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company shall submit the list called for under item number 6 in order 344 of August 10, 2009, within thirty days of the date of this Supplemental Order, i.e. on or before the close of business on October 19, 2009. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 09/11/2009 (kbo)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' unopposed 340 Motion for Leave to File; DENYING State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's 91 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; GRANTING State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's 96 Motion for Summar y Judgment; DENYING State Farm Fire Insurance Company's 98 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING Haag Engineering Company's 106 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DENYING Haag Engineering Company's 108 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING R elators' 206 Motion to Clarify the Order excluding their testimony in civil actions against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. To the extent the Relators have relevant knowledge, they will be permitted to testify in all further proceedings in this action. Further proceedings in this action shall be limited to the specific allegations of the Amended Complaint, i.e. to the allegation the payment of the limits of SFIP coverage on the McIntosh property and the presentment of a claim for reimbursement to the United States of America constitutes a violation of the FCA. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company shall submit, in camera, a list containing the name of the insured, the address of the insured property, and the amount of flood insurance paid, for all SFIP claims that meet three criteria. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 08/10/2009 (kbo)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER: Granting 284 Relators' Motion to Dismiss ONLY Defendants E. A. Renfroe & Company, Inc., Gene Renfroe, and Jana Renfroe, WITH PREJUDICE as to Relators, and WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the United States of America ; each party shall bear its own costs; ORDER finding as moot 115 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 179 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 181 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge L. T. Senter, Jr on 5/18/2009. (Peters, Catherine)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER re Relators' 284 motion to voluntarily dismiss Counts I through IV as to Defendants E.A. Renfroe & Company, Inc., Gene Renfroe, and Jana Renfroe. A period of fifteen days from the date of this order shall be allowed within which the Uni ted States may file its objection, if any, to the dismissal of Counts I through IV as to Defendants E.A. Renfroe & Company, Inc., Gene Renfroe, and Jana Renfroe. If the United States files no objection on or before the expiration of the fifteen-day period, it will be considered as consent to the relief requested, and the Relators motion will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 04/28/2009 (kbo)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER: All parties shall arrange for and schedule the discovery allowed by the order. The Court will schedule a pre-hearing conference in the near future. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 04/20/2009 (kbo)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER CONCERNING DISCOVERY PRIOR TO HEARING ON CONSOLIDATED MOTIONS: The Court orders the Relators, on or before noon on Friday, March 27, 2009, to submit a concise summary of their reasons for wishing to depose Mike Church, Ron Muchk, and Linda Much k. This summary should state clearly the information the Relators expect these individuals to have and the relationship that information has to the McIntosh flood claim. The Court will not approve the deposition of any person who is not directly in volved with State Farm's investigation and payment of the McIntosh flood claim. The Court requires the defendants to state, on or before noon on Friday April 3, 2009, whether they object to the production of the documents listed above and wheth er they object to allowing the Relators to take the depositions of all or any of these seven witnesses. If the defendants do object, they are to state the grounds for their objections with reasonable particularity. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 03/20/2009 (kbo)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER denying Relators' 212 Motion ; granting Relators' 214 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (Responses due by 3/2/2009); granting Relators' 215 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; granting State Farm's 226 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying Relators' 230 Motion. The Court will schedule a hearing on the pending motions. Signed by District Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 02/12/2009 (kbo)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting Relators' unopposed 242 Motion to Dismiss; granting Relators' unopposed 243 Motion to Dismiss; granting Relators' unopposed 248 Motion to Dismiss; granting Relators' unopposed 250 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 01/05/2009 (kbo)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER: If the United States files no objection on or before January 17, 2009, the Relators' motions 242 243 248 250 to dismiss this action as to Rimkus Consulting Group, Inc., Jade Engineering, Exponent, Inc., and Structures Group will be GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 11/14/2008 (kbo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigsby et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cori Rigsby
Represented By: Benjamin R. Davidson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri Rigsby
Represented By: Benjamin R. Davidson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forensic Analysis Engineering Corporation
Represented By: Robert D. Gholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haag Engineering Co.
Represented By: Larry G. Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda B. Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Felicia C. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: State Farm Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda B. Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Cori Rigsby
Represented By: Cecil Maison Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kerri Rigsby
Represented By: Cecil Maison Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?