McBroom et al v. Payne et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01222
Filed: December 4, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting 257 Motion for Reconsideration. Each party shall bear their own costs; and denying 265 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 4/11/11 (RLW)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 256 JUDGMENT ON THE SECTION 1983 CLAIMS: Ordered that the Plaintiff shall take nothing on her Section 1983 claim, that her Section 1983 claim be dismissed on the merits, and that the Defendant, John Massengill, shall recover costs from the Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/20/10. (JCH)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 175 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/06/2010 (Guirola, Louis)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBroom et al v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?