Catlin Syndicate Limited v. Imperial Palace of Mississippi, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Catlin Syndicate Limited
Defendant: Imperial Palace of Mississippi, Inc. and Imperial Palace of Mississippi, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00097
Filed: March 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Halil S. Ozerden
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 JUDGMENT/ORDER granting 78 Motion to Dismiss: The claims of Plaintiff, Catlin Syndicate Limited are dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants; and the claims of Counter-Plaintiffs, Imperial Palace of Mississippi, Inc. and Imperial Palace of Mississippi, LLC are dismissed with prejudice as to Counter-Defendant, with each of these parties bearing their own respective costs and attorney's fees. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 1/5/11. (RLW)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Strike, denying Defendants' 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 12/15/2008. (EMN)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Catlin Syndicate Limited's 28 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 11/3/2008. (EMN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catlin Syndicate Limited v. Imperial Palace of Mississippi, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catlin Syndicate Limited
Represented By: Mark V. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Palace of Mississippi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Palace of Mississippi, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?