Shook et al v. Winn-Dixie Montgomery Leasing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sharee M. Shook and Don M. Steinburg
Defendant: Winn-Dixie Montgomery Leasing, LLC and Winn-Dixie Montgomery, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00330
Filed: July 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Pearl River
Presiding Judge: Halil S. Ozerden
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 1/12/2010. (Brown, T.)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying 53 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine.Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 1/11/2010 (Brown, T.)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 43 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 55 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 12/4/2009. (Brown, T.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shook et al v. Winn-Dixie Montgomery Leasing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharee M. Shook
Represented By: David A. Easson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don M. Steinburg
Represented By: David A. Easson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winn-Dixie Montgomery Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winn-Dixie Montgomery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?