Robohm et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Donald Robohm and Natalie Robohm
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and John Does
Case Number: 1:2008cv00490
Filed: August 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: L. T. Senter
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Order granting 106 Joint Motion of Dismissal with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge L. T. Senter, Jr on 11/16/2010. (Peters, Catherine)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER ON MOTION TO ENFORCE AND DISMISSAL: It is ORDERED that State Farm Fire & Casualty Company shall tender the settlement proceeds, less those amounts assessed the plaintiffs, within five days of this Order, along with the referenced Release. The plaintiffs shall execute the Release (without further additions or changes) within 14 days of receipt and shall not negotiate any tendered funds until such time the fully-executed release is returned to State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. This being the sole remaining unresolved issue, this case and all its claims are hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to take such action to ensure that the letter and spirit of this and other orders of the court are properly enforced. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 11/02/2010 (kbo)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's 5 Motion to Dismiss; denying Plaintiffs' 10 Motion to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 05/07/2009 (kbo)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO MEDIATE. Copy of order and docket sheet (to provide names and addresses of attorneys) mailed to American Arbitration Association, Dallas, TX. Signed by Senior Judge L. T. Senter, Jr, on 03/23/2009. (kbo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robohm et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Robohm
Represented By: Stephen Wright Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Robohm
Represented By: Stephen Wright Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?