Thorson v. Epps et al

Plaintiff: Roger Thorson
Defendant: Christopher Epps, Mississippi Department of Corrections and Jim Hood
Case Number: 1:2012cv00067
Filed: March 2, 2012
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Sunflower
Presiding Judge: Daniel P. Jordan
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Nicholas Aldrich, Jr. authorized to proceed as counsel in this matter; granting 46 Motion to Stay Proceedings; proceedings stayed until thirty days after the entry of a final judgment in Jordan v. Fisher,3:15cv295HTW-LRA. Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on March 10, 2016 (Rushing, Terryl)
October 2, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Granting Motion for Additional Time Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on October 2, 2015 (Rushing, Terryl)
January 13, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Substituting Respondent Commissioner, to replace Christopher Epps as Respondent with Marshall L. Fisher, Commissioner of the Mississippi Department of Corrections. Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on January 13, 2015 (Rushing, Terryl)
April 30, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Briefing Schedule; Respondents must file state-court record by June 2, 2014; Petitioner must file memorandum by June 2, 2014; Respondents must file responsive brief within 60 days of service of Petitioner's memorandum; Petitioner may file reply memorandum within 30 days of service of Respondents' memorandum. Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on April 30, 2014 (Rushing, Terryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorson v. Epps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?