Trout Point Lodge, Limited et al v. Handshoe
Plaintiff: Trout Point Lodge, Limited, Vaughn Perret and Charles Leary
Defendant: Doug K. Handshoe
Case Number: 1:2012cv00090
Filed: March 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Hancock
Presiding Judge: John M. Roper
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER to 97 Order on Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/26/17 (Whitsitt, K)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 70 Motion to Vacate Order ; denying 72 Motion to Vacate Order Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 07/08/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Plaintiff is awarded statutory attroney fees in the amount of $48,000.00 pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 4105. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/11/2013 (Guirola, Louis)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 38 Motion for Bond Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/25/2013 (Guirola, Louis)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trout Point Lodge, Limited et al v. Handshoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trout Point Lodge, Limited
Represented By: Henry F. Laird, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn Perret
Represented By: Henry F. Laird, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Leary
Represented By: Henry F. Laird, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug K. Handshoe
Represented By: G. Gerald Cruthird
Represented By: Jack E. Truitt - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?