Wright v. Christopher Epps
Defendant: Christopher Epps
Petitioner: Earl Lee Wright
Case Number: 1:2013cv00584
Filed: October 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 54 Motion for Certificate of Appealability Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 12/20/2016 (dtj)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT: Ordered that this cause is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 9/4/14. (RLW)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker dismissing case with prejudice. A separate Judgment shall be entered in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on September 4, 2014 (dsl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Christopher Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Earl Lee Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Epps
Represented By: Jim Hood
Represented By: Lesley G. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?