Evans v. State of Mississippi
Plaintiff: Curtis Chrishawn Evans
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Case Number: 1:2014cv00208
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED ORDER to reflect correct signature date. Order 36 had incorrect signature date. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/7/2017 (dtj)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying as moot 29 Motion to Order Complete Transcript form the Court Reporter Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/7/2017 (dtj)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT: Ordered that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/3/16. (JCH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Chrishawn Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Jim Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?