Greenwich Insurance Company et al v. Capsco Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Greenwich Insurance Company and Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Defendant: Capsco Industries, Inc., W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company, Harrah's Entertainment, Inc. and Ground Control, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00297
Filed: July 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John C. Gargiulo
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying 140 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 09/17/2017 (Guirola, Louis)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying 127 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 131 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 08/18/2017 (Guirola, Louis)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion to Lift Stay Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 5/11/2017 (wld)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/08/2014 (Guirola, Louis)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenwich Insurance Company et al v. Capsco Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenwich Insurance Company
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Represented By: Michael Riley Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: John A. Banahan
Represented By: Michael Riley Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capsco Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrah's Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ground Control, LLC
Represented By: Blewett W. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?