Davis v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Linda F. Davis
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: General Counsel SSA-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2015cv00265
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Carolyn W. Colvin against Linda F. Davis. This Civil Action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/6/17. (RLW)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #14 Motion for Summary Judgment and the decision of the Commissioner is affirmed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/6/17. (RLW)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #19: Based on the title of the document, the event code "Memorandum in Opposition" should have been used. Attorney is not required to refile. (RLW)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Response in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Social Security by Linda F. Davis (Wicklund - PHV, Edward), #15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Social Security filed by Linda F. Davis (Wicklund - PHV, Edward) filed by Carolyn W. Colvin (Perez - Federal Gov, Marc)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support of Commissioner's Decision. Defendant's brief is due 5/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/15/2016 (HM)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum Brief by Carolyn W. Colvin (Perez - Federal Gov, Marc)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc A. Perez - Federal Gov on behalf of Carolyn W. Colvin (Perez - Federal Gov, Marc)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 14 and # 15. The case number on both of these pleadings is incorrect. All future filings should reflect the correct case number 1:15cv265 JCG. (JCH)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Social Security filed by Linda F. Davis (Wicklund - PHV, Edward)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Social Security by Linda F. Davis (Wicklund - PHV, Edward)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief. Plaintiff's Brief is due 2/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/22/2016 (HM)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 12. Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are JCG, which should be used on all future filings. (JCH)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Soc Sec brief by Linda F. Davis (Wicklund - PHV, Edward)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE UPON CONSENT. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo for all further proceedings. District Judge Halil S. Ozerden no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 12/28/15 (RLW)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Carolyn W. Colvin, Linda F. Davis. (RLW)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carolyn W. Colvin.(Eldridge, Cynthia)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Linda F. Davis. Carolyn W. Colvin served on 9/23/2015, answer due 12/22/2015. Service made upon: U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. (Wicklund - PHV, Edward)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Carolyn W. Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (RLW)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Edward A. Wicklund be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff in association with local counsel upon payment of the pro hac admission fees and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/28/2015 (AB)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring answer and briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/26/2015 (HM)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/26/2015 (HM)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 First MOTION for Edward A. Wicklund, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Linda F. Davis (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Varnado, Mager)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Edward A. Wicklund, Esq. receipt number 0538-3016075 $ 100 (Varnado, Mager)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Linda F. Davis (RLW)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn W. Colvin, filed by Linda F. Davis (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Appeals Council Notice dated 6/13/15) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda F. Davis
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund - PHV
Represented By: Mager A. Varnado, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Cynthia Lynn Eldridge-Federal Gov
Represented By: Marc A. Perez-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: General Counsel SSA-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?