Seahorn Investments, LLC v. Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP et al
Plaintiff: Seahorn Investments, LLC
Defendant: Goodman Global, Inc. and Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP
Case Number: 1:2015cv00311
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Hancock
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2017 Filing 28 SUPREME COURT ORDER denying certiorari. (Attachments: #1 - USCA letter) (JCH)
February 22, 2017 Filing 27 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE as to #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Seahorn Investments, LLC. Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. (JCH)
February 22, 2017 Filing 26 Copy of Opinion - USCA re #24 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 - USCA letter)(JCH)
February 11, 2016 Appeal Remark re #24 Notice of Appeal : Appeal Record has been certified and accepted by the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. Parties may access the record via the Fifth Circuit website if a notice of appearance has been filed with the Fifth Circuit. (JCH)
February 2, 2016 Appeal Remark re #24 Notice of Appeal : Record has been certified for appeal purposes, waiting on acceptance by USCA. (JCH)
February 2, 2016 USCA Case Number 16-60066 for #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Seahorn Investments, LLC. (JCH)
January 29, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE Appellant's Certificate with Respect to Transcript by Seahorn Investments, LLC re #24 Notice of Appeal (Corlew, John)
January 25, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #23 Judgment by Seahorn Investments, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0538-3111383. Appeal Record due by 1/27/2016 (Corlew, John)
January 25, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 24. 1) Appeal record deadline was terminated by the Clerk. Deadlines should not be set by attorney. 2) Pursuant to Fed.R.Cr.P. Rule 49(d) and Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 11(a) states that date, signature, address, e-mail address and telephone number are used at the conclusion of pleadings and other papers that require a signature. Document is undated (on respectfully submitted portion), but the date will be construed as the date of electronic filing. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (JCH)
December 28, 2015 Filing 23 FINAL JUDGMENT: This civil action is Dismissed. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 12/28/2015 (wld)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 12/28/2015 (wld)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/17-19/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Halil S. Ozerden. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/18/2015 (AB)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 1/6/2016. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2016. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/18/2016. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 3/1/2016. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 4/1/2016. Discovery due by 6/1/2016. Motions due by 6/15/2016. Settlement Conference set for 8/9/2016 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. On or before 11/8/2016, the parties must report to the undersigned all ADR efforts taken. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15-17/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Halil S. Ozerden. Jury Trial is set for a three week trial calendar beginning on 2/6/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 706 (Gulfport) before District Judge Halil S. Ozerden. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2016. ETT: 4-5 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/17/2015 (AB)
December 17, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/17/2015. PARTICIPANTS: J. Scott Corlew and John G. Corlew (counsel for Plaintiff); Hugh Ruston Comley and Kyle T. Cutts - PHV (counsel for Defendants). A Case Management Order will be entered. (AB)
December 2, 2015 Reset Hearing: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET for 12/17/2015 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
November 20, 2015 Reset Hearing: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule the Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET for 12/11/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
November 16, 2015 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seahorn Investments, LLC (Corlew, J. Scott)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Theodore M. Grossman be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/5/2015 (AB)
November 4, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION for Theodore M. Grossman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Goodman Global, Inc., Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing)(Ulmer, Michael)
November 4, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Theodore M. Grossman receipt number 0538-3063100 $ 100 (Ulmer, Michael)
October 16, 2015 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Goodman Global, Inc., Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP (Ulmer, Michael)
October 15, 2015 Reset Hearing: Due to a conflict with counsel for Plaintiff's schedule, the Telephonic Case Management Conference is RESET for 11/20/2015 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. Parties are to refer to the Rule 16(a) Initial Order #7 for deadlines and instructions. (AB)
October 13, 2015 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 16. Incorrect linkage made. The Memorandum in Support should be linked to the Motion to Dismiss. All related filings to motions (using the "Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (JCH)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Response to Order re #13 ORDER Requiring Briefing on Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on October 2, 2015. (ENW) filed by Goodman Global, Inc., Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Malcolm Southern)(Ulmer, Michael)
October 9, 2015 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 Response to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Seahorn Investments, LLC (Corlew, John) Modified to add link to motion on 10/13/2015 (JCH).
October 9, 2015 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Seahorn Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Emails Sept 11, 2012-Oct 15, 2012, #2 Exhibit 2-Goodman's Limited Warranty)(Corlew, John)
October 9, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Corlew on behalf of Seahorn Investments, LLC (Corlew, John)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Requiring Briefing on Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on October 2, 2015. (ENW)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Time. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on October 2, 2015. (ENW) (Main Document 12 replaced on 10/2/2015) (wld).
October 2, 2015 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12. Document was replaced to correct the case number on the document only. The order was correct in all other respects. (wld)
October 1, 2015 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Seahorn Investments, LLC (Corlew, J. Scott)
October 1, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Seahorn Investments, LLC (Corlew, J. Scott)
October 1, 2015 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Seahorn Investments, LLC (Corlew, J. Scott)
October 1, 2015 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Seahorn Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Scott Corlew)(Corlew, J. Scott)
September 23, 2015 Filing 7 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2015 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Kyle T. Cutts be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP and Goodman Global, Inc. in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/23/2015 (AB)
September 22, 2015 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Goodman Global, Inc., Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hiscox Complaint)(Comley, Hugh)
September 22, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Goodman Global, Inc., Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP (Comley, Hugh)
September 21, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION for Kyle T. Cutts to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Goodman Global, Inc., Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing)(Ulmer, Michael)
September 21, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Kyle T. Cutts receipt number 0538-3032450 $ 100 (Ulmer, Michael)
September 16, 2015 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodman Global, Inc., Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP identifying Corporate Parent Daikin Industries, Ltd. for Goodman Global, Inc., Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP. (Ulmer, Michael)
September 16, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Ulmer on behalf of Goodman Global, Inc., Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP (Ulmer, Michael)
September 15, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Goodman Global, Inc., Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP from Hancock County Circuit Court, case number 15-0281. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 14643007307) Jury trial requested in lower court. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Lower Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Malcolm Southern, #4 Exhibit C - 2014 LLC Annual Report)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seahorn Investments, LLC v. Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seahorn Investments, LLC
Represented By: John G. Corlew
Represented By: J. Scott Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Global, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle T. Cutts - PHV
Represented By: Hugh Ruston Comley
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Theodore M. Grossman - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Manufacturing Company, LP
Represented By: Kyle T. Cutts - PHV
Represented By: Hugh Ruston Comley
Represented By: Michael W. Ulmer
Represented By: Theodore M. Grossman - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?