Joan Cravens Construction, Inc. et al v. Deas Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joan Cravens Construction, Inc. and Jason V. Smith
Defendant: Deas Construction, Inc. and Weather Shield Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00385
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 JUDGMENT: This matter has settled and is dismissed with prejudice as to all parties. Ordered that this matter having been concluded, all motions pending in this matter, if any, are hereby moot and accordingly dismissed. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 3/24/17. (RLW)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER denying as moot 266 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 3/21/2017 (dtj)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER denying 196 Motion to Exclude or Limit Portions of the Expert Testimony of William D. Smith Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/2/2017 (dtj)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER. Plaintiff's have until on or before February 7, 2017 to respond to 268 . If Movants wish to file a rebuttal, they may do so on or before February 14, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/27/2017 (dtj)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER. Responses to 266 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration are due on or before February 3, 2017. If Movants wish to file a rebuttal, they may do so on or before February 10, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/23/2017 (dtj)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 244 Motion in Limine; denying 248 Motion in Limine; denying 250 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 252 Motion in Limine; denying 254 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 263 Motion for Leave to File Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/18/2017 (dtj)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER. Responses to Motions 248 , 250 , 252 and 254 are due seven days prior to the pretrial conference. Responses due January 12, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/6/2017 (dtj)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER re Motion in Limine 216 and Motion in Limine 244 . Responses to these Motions are due seven days prior to the pretrial conference. Responses due on or before January 12, 2017. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/4/2017 (dtj)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER denying 237 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/3/2017 (dtj)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Deas' 183 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendants' 186 Motion to Exclude; Defendant Weather Shield's granting in part and denying in part 189 Motion for Summary Jud gment; granting Plaintiffs' 192 Motion to Exclude; denying Plaintiffs' 194 Motion to Exclude Connell; denying in part and deferring in part Plaintiffs' 196 Motion to Exclude Smith. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on November 30, 2016 (dsl)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting 169 Motion to Strike the Errata Sheet of George Denmark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on October 4, 2016. (js)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion to Seal Document; granting in part and denying in part 104 Motion to Compel. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 6/30/16. (RLW)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 81 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting 81 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 90 Motion to Dismiss. The previous Order 77 is amended to reflect that the MCPA claim is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/23/2016 (scp)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are given 14 days from the date of this Order to amend their Complaint as set forth in the Order. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/5/2016 (scp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joan Cravens Construction, Inc. et al v. Deas Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Cravens Construction, Inc.
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason V. Smith
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deas Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert Larose Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weather Shield Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Larry G. Canada
Represented By: Kathryn Breard Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?