Airey v. A.O. Smith Water Products Co. et al
Plaintiff: Beatrice H. Airey
Defendant: A.O. Smith Water Products Co., Ingersoll-Rand Company, General Electric Company, Foster Wheeler, LLC, Air & Liquid Systmes Corp., CBS Corp., 3M Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Gardner Denver Nash, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. and John and/or Janes Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2016cv00317
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting Joint Ore Tenus Motion to Dismiss the plaintiff's claims against IMO Industries, Inc. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 5/29/2018. (BR)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting Ore Tenus Motion to Dismiss with prejudice CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 5/1/2018. (BR)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting Joint Ore Tenus Motion to Dismiss the plaintiffs' claims against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 3/28/2018. (BR)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AGREED ORDER dismissing the plaintiffs' claims against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 3/21/2018. (BR)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting Ore Tenus Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's claims against General Electric Company with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 3/15/2018. (BR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Airey v. A.O. Smith Water Products Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice H. Airey
Represented By: James L. Farragut, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Water Products Co.
Represented By: Meade W. Mitchell
Represented By: Edward W. Mizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Sarah E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systmes Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp.
Represented By: Rose Marie Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Claire W. Ketner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Nash, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Kimberly Paige Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Janes Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?