The Lamar Company, LLC v. The Mississippi Transportation Commission
Plaintiff: The Lamar Company, LLC
Defendant: The Mississippi Transportation Commission
Case Number: 1:2017cv00149
Filed: May 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Walker
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES( Show Cause Response due by 8/30/2018 ) Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 08/23/2018 (Guirola, Louis)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SECOND ORDER REQUIRING BRIEFS REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. The parties are ordered to provide briefs regarding diversity jurisdiction by June 15, 2018. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 6/6/2018. (BR)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REQUIRING BRIEFS ON THE QUESTION OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Briefs due on or before June 4, 2018. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 05/14/2018 (Guirola, Louis)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Lamar Company, LLC v. The Mississippi Transportation Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lamar Company, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mississippi Transportation Commission
Represented By: Rodney M. Love-State Gov
Represented By: Ellie Burnham Word-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?