Dickens et al v. Autozone, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Dickens and Karla Dickens
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Carquest Corporation, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Konecranes, Inc., Ford Motor Company, William Powell Company, Crane Co., Detroit Diesel Corporation, Baldor Electric Company, Autozone, Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Joy Global Surface Mining Inc., John Does 1-30, Perrigo Company, Dana Companies LLC, Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Edelbrock Corporation, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Bosch Brake Components LLC, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., A-1 Auto Parts & Repair, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Manitowoc Company, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, John Crane, Inc., Trinity Marine Products, Inc., Teikoku USA Inc., CBS Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Advance Auto Parts, Inc., General Parts, Inc., Eaton Hydraulics LLC, Bell Auto Parts, Inc., Markey Machinery Co. Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Brenntag North America, Inc., Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Velan Valve Corporation, General Electric Company, Advance Auto Parts, Inc. doing business as Carquest, Konecranes, Inc. sued individually doing business as Kranco Crane Services Inc. doing business as Crane Pro Parts, Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc., P&H Mining Equipment Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Viacom, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company sued individually, doing business as, and as successor to American Talc Company, Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company, Eaton Hydraulics, Inc., General Parts, Inc. doing business as Carquest Auto Parts, Inc. and Allied-Signal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00162
Filed: May 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Louis Guirola
2 Judge: Robert P Myers
3 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 481 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to William Dickens by Karla Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER denying #475 Motion for Reconsideration re #405 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Willful and Wanton Conduct Cause of Action and Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Ford Motor Company, #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Causation filed by Ford Motor Company Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 06/09/2021 (Guirola, Louis)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER CANCELLING HEARINGS: In light of the recent settlement notification, the Pretrial Conference and the Jury Trial set in this matter are cancelled. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE BY THIS COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 5/11/2021. (VLK)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Settlement by Karla Dickens, William Dickens and Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC per email notification of 5/10/2021. (AB)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER ORDER suspending deadlines for 60 days. The Plaintiffs and Defendant Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC have informed the Court that they have settled and have requested 60 days to finalize the settlement. The parties are directed to submit a proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal to District Judge Guirola's chambers on or before July 9, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/10/2021 (AB)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 479 REPLY to Response to Motion re #478 Response in Opposition to #475 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 478 RESPONSE in Opposition re #475 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #477 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due 4/28/2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 04/15/2021 (cf)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #476 Memorandum in Support, #475 MOTION for Reconsideration by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet Printed 04.14.2021, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Janika D. Polk)(Polk, Janika)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER: To accord with Special Order # 13 dated March 16, 2021 by Chief Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III, regarding the coronavirus pandemic, the Pretrial Conference and the Jury Trial in this matter are continued. Jury Trial is set for a three week trial calendar beginning on 7/12/2021 in Courtroom 606 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Date and time for the trial to begin will be discussed during the Pretrial Conference. The Pretrial Conference is set for 6/22/2021 at 1:30 p.m. in Chambers 614 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE BY THIS COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 3/29/2021. (VLK)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #475 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 475 MOTION for Reconsideration by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 474 AGREED ORDER granting #473 Joint Motion to Dismiss Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/22/2021 (cf)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 473 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Honeywell International, Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 472 AGREED ORDER granting #469 Joint Motion to Dismiss Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/12/2021 (cf)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #395 Motion for Summary Judgment. Movant has been dismissed by #472 Agreed Order. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/12/2021 (cf)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER granting #401 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #405 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/11/2021 (Guirola, Louis)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #397 Motion in Limine; finding as moot #403 Motion to Exclude; finding as moot #407 Motion to Exclude; finding as moot #412 Motion to Exclude; finding as moot #419 Motion to Exclude; finding as moot #426 Motion to Exclude. Movant has been dismissed per #471 Order. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/11/2021 (cf)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #411 Motion for Summary Judgment. The movant has been dismissed by #444 Agreed Order. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/10/2021 (cf)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: The Minute Entry entered 1/25/2021 will be disregarded on the docket and new Minute Entries will be entered. (AB)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo: Settlement Conference held on 1/25/2021. PARTICIPANTS: Cameron M. McCormick and Frank J. Wathen - PHV (counsel for Plaintiffs); Bradley Adam Hays (counsel for Defendant Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC). Plaintiff William and Karla Dickens and Defendant Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC: After lengthy negotiations, the matter did not settle however, significant progress was made and settlement negotiations are ongoing. (AB)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo: Settlement Conference held on 1/25/2021. PARTICIPANTS: Cameron M. McCormick and Frank J. Wathen - PHV (counsel for Plaintiffs); Janika D. Polk (counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company). Plaintiff William and Karla Dickens and Defendant Ford Motor Company. After lengthy negotiations, the matter did not settle. (AB)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ***DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY corrected entries will follow*** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo: Settlement Conference held on 1/25/2021. Plaintiff William and Karla Dickens and Defendant Ford Motor Company: After lengthy negotiations, the matter did not settle. Plaintiff William and Karla Dickens and Defendant Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC: After lengthy negotiations, the matter did not settle however, significant progress was made and settlement negotiations are ongoing. PARTICIPANTS: Cameron M. McCormick and Frank J. Wathen - PHV (counsel for Plaintiffs); Bradley Adam Hays (counsel for Defendant Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC); Janika D. Polk (counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company). (AB) Modified on 1/26/2021 (AB).
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER directing Plaintiff William and Karla Dickens and Defendant Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC and Ford Motor Company to confer and provide a joint settlement status to the Court, via its chambers email, on or before close of business February 17, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/25/2021 (AB)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 470 AGREED ORDER granting #466 Joint Motion to Dismiss Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 01/22/2021 (cf)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 469 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Frederick, Zelma)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER granting #467 Joint Motion to Dismiss Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 01/22/2021 (cf)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Perrigo Company (Owen, Joe)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for Telephonic Conference before Judge Gargiulo regarding the status of settlement. Defendants Perrigro Company, Honeywell International, Inc., General Electric Company, and Bosch Brake Components have settled their claims. Orders to follow. (AG)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 469. Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are LG-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. (JCH)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER suspending deadlines for 14 days. The Plaintiffs and Defendant Perrigro have settled their claims and have requested 14 days to finalize the settlement. The parties are directed to submit a proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal to District Judge Guirola's chambers on or before February 6, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/22/2021 (AG)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER suspending deadlines for 30 days. The Plaintiffs and Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. and Defendant Bosch Brake Components LLC have settled their claims and have requested 30 days to finalize the settlement. The parties are directed to submit a proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal to District Judge Guirola's chambers on or before February 22, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/22/2021 (AG)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by General Electric Company (Cole, Edderek)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 465 NOTICE of Settlement by Perrigo Company (Owen, Joe)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #391 Motion for Summary Judgment. The movant has been dismissed by #464 Agreed Order. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 01/21/2021 (cf)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Settlement by William Dickens, General Electric Company and Perrigo Company. The parties have informed the Court that all claims by and between the Plaintiffs and Defendant General Electric Company and Defendant Perrigo Company have settled. The parties require additional time in order to finalize the settlement. (AB)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo will be held telephonically. At 1:30 PM counsel are directed to call the Court's AT&T Toll-Free Audio Conference Number: 877-336-1829; Access Code: 5650398#. The parties and all others with settlement authority must be on stand-by and available by phone until the conference is concluded as they will be added to the telephonic discussions when necessary. (AB)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER. Plaintiffs and Defendant General Electric Company and Defendant Perrigo Company have informed the Court that they have settled their claims and have requested time to finalize the settlement. The parties are directed to submit a proposed Order of Dismissal to Judge Guirola's chambers or file a Stipulation of Dismissal on or before January 23, 2021. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/20/2021 (AB)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Calendar Setting: Counsel for Plaintiff, defendant General Electric Company and defendant Perrigo Company are directed to call the Court's AT&T Toll-Free Audio Conference Number: 877-336-1829; Access Code: 5650398# for the TELEPHONIC Status Conference regarding settlement set for 10/22/2020 at 10:00 AM. (AB)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference regarding status of settlement set for 1/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. Counsel for Plaintiff will place the call to Judge Gargiulo's Chambers with counsel for defendant General Electric Company and counsel for defendant Perrigo Company already on the line.(AB)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Settlement by Karla Dickens, William Dickens and Honeywell International, Inc. (AB)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 464 AGREED ORDER granting #463 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 01/19/2021 (cf)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 463 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 462 Rebuttal re #412 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Jacqueline Moline filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 461 Rebuttal re #426 MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Rebuttal re #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Causation filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 459 Rebuttal re #419 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Steven Compton filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Rebuttal re #405 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Willful and Wanton Conduct Cause of Action and Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 457 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Ziffer, Lee)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #457 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due 1/5/2021 as to #401 Motion for Summary Judgment, #405 Motion for Summary Judgment, #407 Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Fractor, #412 Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Moline, #419 Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Compton, and #426 Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Kradin. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/17/2020 (cf)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 457. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (JCH)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ATTACHMENT re #448 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Exhibits 1 through 3 to Plaintiffs' Memo Brief in Support of Response in Opposition to Defendant Ford Motor Co.'s Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Jacqueline Moline by William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Moline Jacqueline CV, #2 Exhibit 2 - Moline Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Moline Depo)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 455. Incorrect linkage made. The Memorandum should be linked to the correct Motion. Attorney linked this document to a disregarded Memorandum. All related filings to motions (using the "Responses and Replies" category, with the exception of "Response to Order") should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (JCH)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #407 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, David Fractor, PH.D. filed by William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dickens Video Depo_, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fractor CV_, #3 Exhibit 3 - Fractor Depo_, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dickens Video Depo_)(Wathen - PHV, Frank) Modified to correct link on 12/16/2020 (JCH).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Response in Opposition re #419 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Steven Compton by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Steven Compton Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Steven Compton Ph.D.)(Ziffer, Lee), #420 MEMORANDUM in Support re #419 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Steven Compton filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee) filed by William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Compton Report-Dickens_, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dickens Video Depo_, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dickens Discovery Depo_, #4 Exhibit 4 - Compton Depo_, #5 Exhibit 5 - Taylor Depo 2-24-09_, #6 Exhibit 6 - Ford Letter to EPA 3.15.85_, #7 Exhibit 7 - Ford Rogs 1984 (1)_, #8 Exhibit 8 - Ford SO1 Rog Answers (120107) IN RE Asb Lit Delaware_)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 Response in Opposition re #426 MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Richard Kradin Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B- Deposition of Richard Kradin)(Ziffer, Lee), #427 MEMORANDUM in Support re #426 MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee) filed by William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Kradin CV_, #2 Exhibit 2 - Kradin Report_, #3 Exhibit 3 - Kradin Depo-Dickens_)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Response in Opposition re #406 MEMORANDUM in Support re #405 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Willful and Wanton Conduct Cause of Action and Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee), #405 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Willful and Wanton Conduct Cause of Action and Claim for Punitive Damages by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of William Dickens, #3 Exhibit C -Video Deposition of William Dickens)(Ziffer, Lee) filed by William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dickens Video Depo, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dickens Discovery Depo, #3 Exhibit 3 - Taylor Depo 022409, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ford Letter to EPA 031585, #5 Exhibit 5 - Ford Rogs 1984, #6 Exhibit 6 - Ford SO1 Rog Answers 120107, #7 Exhibit 7 - Letter from Toth to Keller 051673, #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter from Lick to Keller 052973, #9 Exhibit 9 - Ford memo re Asb Substitutes 051077, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ford Letter to CARB 072387, #11 Exhibit 11 - Lawrence Roslinski 010308, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1934 to 1935 ASME Membership excerpts, #13 Exhibit 13 - J.M. Dallaville, The Control of Industrial Dust.. the Problem October 1933, #14 Exhibit 14 - Reuel C. Stratton, Toxic Dusts Their Origin and Sources in Various Industries Mechanical Engineering Feb. 1935, #15 Exhibit 15 - Memo on Indus. Diseases of Silicosis and Asbestosis, July 1932 (1)_, #16 Exhibit 16 - Hickish - Exposure to Asb during Servicing of Brakes - Jully 1968_, #17 Exhibit 17 - Hickish & Knight - Exposure to Asb During Brake Maint, #18 Exhibit 18 - Gealer Memo re Asb Bibliographies_ - 10.20.70_, #19 Exhibit 19 - EPA, June 1986_, #20 Exhibit 20 - Knight, Hickish Investigations Into Alt. Forms, 1970_, #21 Exhibit 21 - Minutes of the FMSI, February 16, 1973 (1)_, #22 Exhibit 22 - Letter from Block to Kotin 6.2.75_, #23 Exhibit 23 - Rohl et al AsbestosExposureDrngBrakeLining Maint_, #24 Exhibit 24 - Ford Maintenance Bulletin No. 137_, #25 Exhibit 25 - Ford Manufacturing Guideline - Rec Work Prac for Handling Asb 1981_, #26 Exhibit 26 - Ford MSDS_, #27 Exhibit 27 - Ford SP2 Endorsement_, #28 Exhibit 28 - Ford Recommends Don't Blow It_)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Response in Opposition re #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Causation by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of William Dickens, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition of Jacqueline Moline, #4 Exhibit D - Deposition of Richard Kradin)(Ziffer, Lee) filed by William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dickens Video Depo, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dickens Discovery Depo, #3 Exhibit 3 - Taylor Depo 022409, #4 Errata 4 - Ford Letter to EPA 031585, #5 Exhibit 5 - Ford Rogs 1984, #6 Exhibit 6 - Ford SO1 Rog Answers, #7 Exhibit 7 - Letter from Toth to Keller 051673, #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter from Lick to Keller 052973, #9 Exhibit 9 - Ford Memo re Asb Substitutes, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ford Letter to CARB 072387, #11 Exhibit 11 - Marcella Duncan - Dana Corp Rep 111612, #12 Exhibit 12 - Austin Depo 092603, #13 Exhibit 13 - Moline Report, #14 Exhibit 13 - Moline Report 1, #15 Exhibit 13 - Moline Report 2, #16 Exhibit 14 - Compton Report, #17 Exhibit 15 - Hickish - Exposure to Asb during Servicing of Brakes, #18 Exhibit 16 - Hickish Knight - Esposure to Asbestos During Brake Mtnc, #19 Exhibit 17 - For Maintenance Bulletin No. 137, #20 Exhibit 18 - EPA June 1986, #21 Exhibit 19 - EPA 2007 Prev Asb Exp Among Brake, #22 Exhibit 20 - OSHA SHIB on Friction, #23 Exhibit 21 - Minutes of the FMSI 021673, #24 Exhibit 22 - 2004 Atkinson abstract Eval of Size of type free partic, #25 Exhibit 23 - Hickish Knight Investigations Into Alt Forms 1970, #26 Exhibit 24 - Rohl et al AsbestosExposureDrngBrakeLiningMaint, #27 Exhibit 25 - Letter from Block to Kotin 060275, #28 Exhibit 26 - Kradin Report)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Response in Opposition re #407 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, David Fractor, PH.D. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Dr. Richard Fractor Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit C -Video Deposition of William Dickens)(Ziffer, Lee) filed by William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Response in Opposition re #412 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Jacqueline Moline by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Dr. Jacqueline Moline Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Dr. Jacqueline Moline's deposition)(Ziffer, Lee) filed by William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #412 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Jacqueline Moline, #414 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Response in Opposition re #431 Joinder in Document by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC to #412 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Jacqueline Moline filed by Ford Motor Company, #419 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Steven Compton filed by Ford Motor Company, #404 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #408 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #407 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, David Fractor, PH.D. filed by Ford Motor Company, #414 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #409 MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial filed by Ford Motor Company, #403 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively Limit Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Arnold Brody filed by Ford Motor Company, #420 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #410 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Ford Motor Company (Hays, Bradley) filed by William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 431. Attorney is advised that this document should not have been titled as a Motion to Join, but as a "Joinder". Also the correct judge initials for this case are LG-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. This document was filed 11/30/20, therefore does not have to be re-filed, but this procedure should be followed in future filings. (JCH)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Joinder in Document by Holley Performance Products, Inc. to #412 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Jacqueline Moline filed by Ford Motor Company, #419 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Steven Compton filed by Ford Motor Company, #404 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #408 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #407 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, David Fractor, PH.D. filed by Ford Motor Company, #426 MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial filed by Ford Motor Company, #414 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #403 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively Limit Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Arnold Brody filed by Ford Motor Company, #427 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #420 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #397 MOTION in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company, #398 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 **DISREGARD**Joinder in Document by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift) Modified on 12/14/2020 (JCH).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 445. Attorney was previously advised that the title of the document should reflect the event chosen in ECF. The Joinder should also be linked to all of the documents referenced within the pleading. Attorney is advised to re-file this document after the title of the document has been modified to reflect that this document is a Joinder and during filing, the document should be linked to all of the pleadings that it pertains to. This document will be disregarded on the docket. (JCH)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 AGREED ORDER granting #443 Joint Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice as to Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/11/2020 (cf)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 AGREED ORDER granting #441 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Caterpillar Inc. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/10/2020 (cf)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Caterpillar, Inc. (Rouse, John)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 AGREED ORDER granting #439 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss as to Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 12/2/2020 (cf)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss (JOINT) by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Meade)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Joinder in Document by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust to #426 MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial filed by Ford Motor Company, #427 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Joinder in Document by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust to #423 MOTION in Limine Omnibus Motions in Limine filed by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, #424 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Joinder in Document by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust to #422 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, #421 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Conditions at Manufacturing Plants filed by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 Joinder in Document by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust to #419 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Steven Compton filed by Ford Motor Company, #420 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Joinder in Document by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust to #412 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Jacqueline Moline filed by Ford Motor Company, #414 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 433 Joinder in Document by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust to #408 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #407 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, David Fractor, PH.D. filed by Ford Motor Company (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Joinder in Document by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust to #404 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #403 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively Limit Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Arnold Brody filed by Ford Motor Company (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 439. 1.) Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are LG-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. 2.) Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.).(JCH)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Joinder in Document by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC to #412 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Jacqueline Moline filed by Ford Motor Company, #419 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Steven Compton filed by Ford Motor Company, #404 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #408 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #407 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, David Fractor, PH.D. filed by Ford Motor Company, #414 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #409 MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial filed by Ford Motor Company, #403 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively Limit Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Arnold Brody filed by Ford Motor Company, #420 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ford Motor Company, #410 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Ford Motor Company (Hays, Bradley)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #430 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs' Responses are due 12/15/2020 as to the #401 Motion for Summary Judgment, #405 Motion for Summary Judgment, #407 Daubert Motion, #412 Daubert Motion, #419 Daubert Motion, and #426 Daubert Motion. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/30/2020 (cf)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by William Dickens and Karla Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 AGREED ORDER granting #425 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/18/2020 (cf)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Markey Machinery Co., Inc. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/18/2020 (cf)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MEMORANDUM in Support re #426 MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Richard Kradin Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B- Deposition of Richard Kradin)(Ziffer, Lee)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by MW Custom Papers, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Agreed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Smyth, John)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 415 - # 418; # 421 - # 424. Attorney is advised that all of these documents have the incorrect judge initials. The correct judge initials for this case are LG-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. (JCH)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 425. 1.) Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are LG-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. 2.) Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (JCH)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #393 Motion for Summary Judgment. The movant has been dismissed by an #428 Agreed Order. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/18/2020 (cf)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 409. Attorney is advised that the incorrect pdf is attached to this document. The correct motion should be re-filed. Also the Memorandum #410 will need to be re-filed and linked to the correct motion. Both documents will be disregarded on the docket. (JCH)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #399 Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts, Drs. Kradin and Moline. The movant has been dismissed by an #428 Agreed Order. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/18/2020 (cf)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MEMORANDUM in Support re #423 MOTION in Limine Omnibus Motions in Limine filed by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MOTION in Limine Omnibus Motions in Limine by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MEMORANDUM in Support re #421 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Conditions at Manufacturing Plants filed by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Conditions at Manufacturing Plants by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MEMORANDUM in Support re #419 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Steven Compton filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Steven Compton by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Steven Compton Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Steven Compton Ph.D.)(Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 MEMORANDUM in Support re #417 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Gold Book filed by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Guide for Preventing Asbestos Disease Among Auto Mechanics)(Hays, Bradley)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Gold Book by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MEMORANDUM in Support re #415 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Relating to the FMSI filed by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Relating to the FMSI by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MEMORANDUM in Support re #412 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Jacqueline Moline filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MEMORANDUM in Support re #411 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Jacqueline Moline by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Jacqueline Moline Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Dr. Jacqueline Moline's deposition)(Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Excerpts - William Dickens (Video Deposition), #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Excerpts - William Dickens (Discovery Deposition), #3 Exhibit C - Deposition Excerpts of Steven Compton, Ph.D., #4 Exhibit D - Deposition Excerpts of Richard Kradin, MD, #5 Exhibit E - Deposition Excerpts of Jacqueline Moline, MD, #6 Exhibit F - Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel regarding production of asbestos bankruptcy trust claim materials)(Hubbard, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 410 **DISREGARD**MEMORANDUM in Support re [] MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee) Modified on 11/18/2020 (JCH).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 **DISREGARD** MOTION to Exclude or, in the Alternative, to Limit the Expert Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Richard Kradin at Trial by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Richard Kradin)(Ziffer, Lee) Modified on 11/18/2020 (JCH).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MEMORANDUM in Support re #407 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, David Fractor, PH.D. filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, David Fractor, PH.D. by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Dr. Richard Fractor Expert Report, #3 Exhibit C -Video Deposition of William Dickens)(Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MEMORANDUM in Support re #405 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Willful and Wanton Conduct Cause of Action and Claim for Punitive Damages filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Willful and Wanton Conduct Cause of Action and Claim for Punitive Damages by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of William Dickens, #3 Exhibit C -Video Deposition of William Dickens)(Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MEMORANDUM in Support re #403 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively Limit Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Arnold Brody filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively Limit Plaintiffs' Expert Witness, Dr. Arnold Brody by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Arnold Brody Expert Report., #2 Exhibit B - Dr. Richard Kradin Expert Report)(Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 MEMORANDUM in Support re #401 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Causation filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Causation by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of William Dickens, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition of Jacqueline Moline, #4 Exhibit D - Deposition of Richard Kradin)(Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MEMORANDUM in Support re #399 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts, Drs. Kradin and Moline filed by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Kuhn, Joanna)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts, Drs. Kradin and Moline by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Kuhn, Joanna)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MEMORANDUM in Support re #397 MOTION in Limine filed by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MOTION in Limine by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint., #3 Exhibit C - EPA Guidance Gold Book, #4 Exhibit D - Current Best Practices, #5 Exhibit E - Lemberger transcript, #6 Exhibit F - Welch Article., #7 Exhibit G - Michaels book excerpts, #8 Exhibit H - Egilman article, #9 Exhibit I - Video Transcript, #10 Exhibit J - E-mail correspondence from Plaintiffs' counsel)(Ziffer, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MEMORANDUM in Support re #395 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Frederick, Zelma)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dickens Discovery Depo 6-19-18, #2 Exhibit B - Dickens Trial Depo 6-19-18, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit Miklautsch, #4 Exhibit D - Morse Affidavit)(Frederick, Zelma)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MEMORANDUM in Support re #393 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Kuhn, Joanna)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Kuhn, Joanna)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MEMORANDUM in Support re #391 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Paustenbach Rep., #2 Exhibit B - William Dickens' Video Dep., #3 Exhibit C - William Dickens' Discovery Dep., #4 Exhibit D - Holley's 26(a)(1) Disclosures, #5 Exhibit E - Weckerly Decl., #6 Exhibit F - Pls.' First Supplemental Disclosure of Expert Witnesses, #7 Exhibit G - Compton Rep., #8 Exhibit H - Compton Dep., #9 Exhibit I - Longo Rep., #10 Exhibit J - Moline Rep., #11 Exhibit K - Moline Dep.)(Abdalla, Mary Clift)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 395. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to label each exhibit with a letter/number in future filings. (JCH)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 393 and # 399. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (JCH)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting #369 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/23/2020 (Guirola, Louis)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE of Cancellation of Deposition by Honeywell International, Inc. re #376 Notice to Take Deposition (Mitchell, Meade)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Unopposed MOTION to Excuse Local Counsel from Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #386 Unopposed Motion to Excuse Local Counsel from Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice. In light of the unopposed nature of the Motion, Local Counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company is excused from attending depositions if Ford is represented at the deposition by at least one attorney who has been admitted pro hac vice in this case. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/9/2020 (AG)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #387 Unopposed Motion to Excuse Local Counsel from Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice. In light of the unopposed nature of the Motion, Local Counsel for Defendant Trinity Marine Products, Inc. is excused from attending depositions if Trinity is represented at the deposition by at least one attorney who has been admitted pro hac vice in this case. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/9/2020 (AG)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 388. Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are LG-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. (JCH)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #388 Unopposed Motion to Excuse Local Counsel from Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice. In light of the unopposed nature of the Motion, Local Counsel for Defendant Holley Performance Products, Inc. is excused from attending depositions if Holley is represented at the deposition by at least one attorney who has been admitted pro hac vice in this case. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/9/2020 (AG)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MOTION to Excuse Local Counsel from Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice, Unopposed by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Wyly, James)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Unopposed MOTION to Excuse Local Counsel From Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #385 Unopposed Motion to Excuse Local Counsel from Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice. In light of the unopposed nature of the Motion, Local Counsel for Plaintiffs is excused from attending depositions if Plaintiffs are represented at the deposition by at least one attorney who has been admitted pro hac vice in this case. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/8/2020 (AG)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 385. Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are LG-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. (JCH)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Unopposed MOTION to Excuse Local Counsel From Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Kradin, M.D. by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requests for Production of Documents)(Mitchell, Meade)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #383 Unopposed Motion to Excuse Local Counsel from Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice. In light of the unopposed nature of the Motion, Local Counsel for Defendant Perrigo Company is excused from attending depositions if Perrigo is represented at the deposition by at least one attorney who has been admitted pro hac vice in this case. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/6/2020 (AG)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 383 Unopposed MOTION to Excuse Local Counsel from Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Perrigo Company (Owen, Joe)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #382 Unopposed Motion to Excuse Local Counsel from Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice. In light of the unopposed nature of the Motion, Local Counsel for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. is excused from attending depositions if Honeywell is represented at the deposition by at least one attorney who has been admitted pro hac vice in this case. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/30/2020 (AG)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Unopposed MOTION to Excuse Local Counsel From Attending Depositions Taken and Defended by Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Honeywell International, Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 381. The Notice to Take Deposition and exhibits are filed as one main document. Exhibits were already scanned separately and docketed as properly identified attachments to the main document within the same docket entry. It was not necessary to attach to main document. (JCH)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Fractor, Ph.D. by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requests for Production of Documents)(Mitchell, Meade)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #380 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin P. Greene. Kevin P. Greene is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/17/2020 (AB)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 380 MOTION for Kevin P. Greene to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4373675) by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Mitchell, Meade)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 RESPONSE to Memorandum re #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Dickens, Karla Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jacqueline Moline, M.D. by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requests for Production of Documents)(Mitchell, Meade)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Compton, Ph.D. by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requests for Production)(Mitchell, Meade)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 376 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Longo, Ph.D. by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requests for Production)(Mitchell, Meade)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jacqueline Moline, M.D by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requests for Production of Documents)(Mitchell, Meade)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER TO FILE SUR-REPLY re #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 09/02/2020 (Guirola, Louis)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 373. Attorney is advised that based on the title of this document and the case law throughout the pleading, it should have been filed as a Memorandum in Support of Motion. Also, it is not necessary to type in "Exh" in the description of the exhibits, because "Exhibit" was selected in the category drop-down box. It duplicates the description to read "Exhibit Exh", which is incorrect. Attorney does not have to re-file, but should follow these procedures in future filings. (JCH)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 REPLY to Response to Motion re #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 6-Second Declaration of Neal Langdon, #2 Exhibit Exh 7-Expert Report of John Henshaw, #3 Exhibit Exh 8-Trinity Responses to Dickens Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit Exh 9-SEW Eurodrive Letter)(Wyly, James)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 372. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (JCH)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 371 RESPONSE in Opposition re #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MEMORANDUM in Support re #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1-Dickens Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit EX 2-SSA Statement, #3 Exhibit EX 3-Purchase Sale Agreement, #4 Exhibit EX 4-Langdon Declaration, #5 Exhibit EX 5-Secretary of State)(Wyly, James)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 369. 1.) Attorney is advised that the correct judge initials for this case are LG-JCG, which should be used on all future filings. 2.) Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. 3.) L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to type in the exhibit letter/number in the description in future filings. (JCH)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Dickens Depo Excerpt, #3 Exhibit SSA Earnings Statement, #4 Exhibit Purchase Sale Agreement, #5 Exhibit Declaration, #6 Exhibit Sec. of State)(Wyly, James)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing: The Settlement Conference is RESET for 1/25/2021 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. Counsel are instructed to submit to Judge Gargiulo, seven (7) days prior to the conference, a memorandum (3 page maximum in PDF format) setting forth a brief explanation of the case, and a candid appraisal of their respective positions, including possible settlement figures. This document is NOT to be exchanged and will be viewed only by the Court. The settlement memoranda should be sent to Judge Gargiulo via e-mail (gargiulo_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov). LOCAL COUNSEL, LEAD COUNSEL AND PARTIES WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY MUST BE PHYSICALLY PRESENT AT THE CONFERENCE (INCLUDING INSURANCE CARRIERS WHO HAVE AUTHORITY). FAILURE TO APPEAR MAY RESULT IN SANCTIONS. (AB)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. on 8/6/20. (RLW)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Attorneys are advised to use the new judge assignment of 1:18cv162 LG-JCG on future filings. (RLW)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 8/3/20. (JCH)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Attorneys are advised to use the new judge assignment of 1:18cv162 LG-RPM on future filings. (JCH)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Designation of Experts by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 NOTICE of Cancellation of Deposition by Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #359 Notice to Take Deposition (Mitchell, Meade)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 NOTICE of Cancellation of Deposition by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #357 Notice to Take Deposition (Mitchell, Meade)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 363 NOTICE of Cancellation of Deposition by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #358 Notice to Take Deposition (Mitchell, Meade)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting #347 Motion to Continue Trial Date and Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 2, 2020 (King, Steve)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/3/2020. Motions due by 11/17/2020. Settlement Conference set for 1/26/2021 09:30 AM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) Walker before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Pretrial Conference set for 4/22-23/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Jury Trial set during a three-week term of Court beginning on 5/10/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/22/2021. EDT: 12-20 days. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/2/2020 (SR)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/2/2020 (SR)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 NOTICE of Cancellation of Deposition by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #350 Notice to Take Deposition (Mitchell, Meade)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #347 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Amend Scheduling Order : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Movant will place the telephone call to Judge Walker's chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #337 Motion to Dismiss, which the Court has treated as a Motion for Summary Judgment. See document #352 . Plaintiff's claims against AutoZone, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 5/20/20. (RLW)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Arnold Brody, Ph.D. by Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requests for Production)(Mitchell, Meade)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jacqueline Moline, M.D. by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requests for Production)(Mitchell, Meade)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Madigan, Ph.D. by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requests for Production)(Mitchell, Meade)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting #355 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. John R. Henderson shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant Ford Motor Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on May 8, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MOTION for John R. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4269762) by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ziffer, Lee)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 355. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (JCH)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #347 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Amend Scheduling Order filed by William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Rebuttal re #347 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Amend Scheduling Order filed by Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER NOTICE OF INTENT TO TREAT MOTION AS A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #338 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Autozone, Inc., #337 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Autozone, Inc. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 04/21/2020 (Guirola, Louis)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 351. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Also, if "exhibit" is selected from the dropdown category, it is not necessary to type in the word "exhibit" in the description. That duplicates the description to read "exhibit exhibit", which is incorrect. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (JCH)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 RESPONSE in Opposition re #347 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Amend Scheduling Order filed by William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 350. The Notice to Take Deposition and exhibits are filed as one main document. Exhibits should be scanned separately and docketed as properly identified attachments to the main document within the same docket entry. Attorney is directed to follow this procedure in future filings. L.U.Civ.R. 7.(b)(2). (JCH)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Longo, Ph.D. by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #349 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #337 MOTION to Dismiss. The Response is due by 4/15/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 4/2/20 (Whitsitt, K)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 349. Attorney is advised that when filing a Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply, the Motion should be linked to the document that it pertains to. This document does not need to be re-filed, but this procedure should be followed in future filings. (JCH)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #347 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Amend Scheduling Order filed by Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Amend Scheduling Order by Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #303 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs' response to the motion included a response to the interrogatory in question, and movant filed no reply. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on April 1, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #345 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/3/2020; Motions, including Daubert motions due 8/17/2020; Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) Walker before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on March 27, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE of Service of Second Supplemental Designation of Experts by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Whitman, Christine)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Discovery, Motion and Settlement Conference Deadline by Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Designation of Experts by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Whitman, Christine)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Autozone, Inc. (Obert, Keith)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Designation of Experts by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Kuhn, Joanna)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Supplemental NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Caterpillar, Inc. (Rouse, John)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 340 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Designation of Experts by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Frederick, Zelma)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Supplemental NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 337. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to label all exhibits in future filings. (JCH)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MEMORANDUM in Support re #337 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Autozone, Inc. (Obert, Keith)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MOTION to Dismiss by Autozone, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A - Affidavit of Mary Denise McCullough)(Obert, Keith)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Whitman, Christine)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Whitman, Christine)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 333 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Wyly, James)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Frederick, Zelma)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Caterpillar, Inc. (Rouse, John)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 NOTICE of Service of Expert Witnesses Disclosure by Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 327 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE of Service of Second Supplemental Disclosure by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Honeywell International, Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE of Service of Second Supplemental Disclosure by Honeywell International, Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE of Service of Expert Disclosure by MW Custom Papers, LLC (Smyth, John)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Perrigo Company (Owen, Joe)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Kuhn, Joanna)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #319 unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 3/25/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on March 9, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Defendants' Expert Witness Deadline by Autozone, Inc., Bosch Brake Components LLC, Caterpillar, Inc., Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Markey Machinery Co. Inc., Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Hubbard, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 319. Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (JCH)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #317 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Timothy A. Clarke shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on March 3, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MOTION for Timothy A. Clarke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4221647) by MW Custom Papers, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Smyth, John)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Bocek Whitman on behalf of Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Whitman, Christine)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Agreed Order of Dismissal without prejudice as to Goulds Pumps, Incorporated. Goulds Pumps, Incorporated terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 3/2/20 (Whitsitt, K)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting #313 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Skylar B. Rudin shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant Ford Motor Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on February 28, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MOTION for Skylar B. Rudin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4218995) by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Ziffer, Lee)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 312. 1.) L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. 2.) This docket entry fails to select all filing parties. Clerks office will edit this docket entry to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. (JCH)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 312 RESPONSE to Motion re #303 MOTION to Compel filed by William Dickens, Karla Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wathen - PHV, Frank) Modified on 2/26/2020 (JCH).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Karla Dickens and Erica Dickens by Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Lance Owen on behalf of Perrigo Company (Owen, Mitchell)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Admissions by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Kuhn, Joanna)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Kuhn, Joanna)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Kuhn, Joanna)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MOTION to Withdraw #300 MOTION to Compel by Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #306 Motion to Withdraw #300 Motion to Compel; terminating #300 Motion to Compel. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on February 12, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #305 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ben F. Galloway, III terminated. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on February 11, 2020. (Joffe, Scherry)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Perrigo Company (Galloway, Ben)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MEMORANDUM in Support re #303 MOTION to Compel filed by Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MOTION to Compel by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Response to Ford's Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B - E-mails from Ford to Plaintiffs requesting witness information, #3 Exhibit C - E-mail dated 1-27-20 attaching meet-and-confer correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - E-mail dated 1-30-20 regarding meet-and-confer, #5 Exhibit E - E-mail dated 2-6-20 attaching Certificate of Good Faith)(Polk, Janika)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 301. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (JCH)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #302 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #302 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response: Response due by 2/14/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 2/7/2020 (SR)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 AFFIDAVIT by William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MOTION to Compel by Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 11/20/18 Eric Przybysz Ltr. to Def. Counsel, with appended chart, #2 Exhibit B 6/10/19 Meade Mitchell Ltr. to Frank Wathen, #3 Exhibit C 7/2/19 Meade Mitchell Ltr. to Frank Wathen, without attachments, #4 Exhibit D 8/2/19 Frank Wathen Ltr. fo Def. Counsel, without attachments, #5 Exhibit E 9/9/19 Meade Mitchell Ltr. to Frank Wathen, without attachments, #6 Exhibit F 12/2/19 Meade Mitchell Ltr. to Frank Wathen, without attachments, #7 Exhibit G 1/22/20 emaiil to Frank Wathen)(Mitchell, Meade)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE of Service of First Supplemental Initial Disclosure by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 NOTICE of Service of First Supplemental Initial Disclosure by Honeywell International, Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Caterpillar, Inc. (Rouse, John)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Caterpillar, Inc. (Rouse, John)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Kuhn, Joanna)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 NOTICE of Service of Response to Requests for Production and Response to Interrogatories by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Kuhn, Joanna)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Agreed ORDER re: Pathology Stipulation and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 29, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #292: Advising attorney that the certificate of service on page 3 is not electronically signed and dated. Also, the month and year is incorrect. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Crump on behalf of General Electric Company (Crump, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna B. Kuhn on behalf of Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Kuhn, Joanna)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker: Telephone Conference held on 10/17/2019 with attorneys Frank J. Wathen - PHV, Keith D. Obert, Vikram S. Bhatia, Zelma M. Frederick, John T. Rouse, Jeffrey P. Hubbard, Amber Barlow - PHV, Joshua A. Leggett, Mary Clift Abdalla, Meade W. Mitchell, Joanna B. Kuhn, Ben F. Galloway III, Michael A. Pichini - PHV, Barbara L. Arras - PHV and Edderek Linnel Cole. The Court will enter an Amended Scheduling Order. (SR)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #287 Motion to Extend Deadline: AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set during a four-week term of Court beginning on 1/4/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 12/16-17/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 1/21/2020. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 3/9/2020. Motions due by 6/15/2020. Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) Walker before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. ADR Report due by 12/9/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/16/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/17/2019 (SR)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as to Ingersoll-Rand Company. Ingersoll-Rand Company terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/15/19 (Whitsitt, K)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #279 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/15/2019 (Guirola, Louis)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 RESPONSE to Motion re #287 MOTION to Extend Expert Reports Deadline filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Email Sept. 6, 2019 M Mitchell to F. Wathen, #2 Exhibit B Email Sept. 30, 2019 F Wathen to M Mitchell)(Mitchell, Meade)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/17/2019 01:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Walker's chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #287 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 11/26/2019; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 1/10/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 1, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #287: Proposed stipulations/orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (RLW)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER vacating the TEXT ORDER entered this date which granted #287 motion to extend deadlines, the Court having been advised that not all counsel agreed to the motion. The Clerk is directed to reinstate Motion #287 as an active motion on the docket. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 2, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MOTION to Extend Expert Reports Deadline by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Joint Stipulation for Division of Tissue, #2 Attachment)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Perrigo Company (Galloway, Ben)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Perrigo Company (Galloway, Ben)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Perrigo Company (Galloway, Ben)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Cole, Edderek)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #282: Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (RLW)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #282 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Response is due by 8/28/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 8/8/19 (Whitsitt, K)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #281 unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 10/1/2019; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 11/15/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 29, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Expert Designation Deadline by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #279 and #280: Defendant's name must be listed through out the pleadings as it was filed in the lower court complaint. If the name is incorrect, attorney is advised to file a Motion to Change Name. (RLW)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edelbrock Corporation (Krutz, Fred)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Edelbrock Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - William Dickens Deposition Excerpts)(Krutz, Fred)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Bosch Brake Components LLC.(Frederick, Zelma)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by General Electric Company.(Cole, Edderek)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #251 Amended Complaint,, Unopposed by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Frederick, Zelma)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Bosch Brake Components LLC answer due 7/2/2019. (King, Steve)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #276 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #251 Amended Complaint. Defendant Bosch Brake Component LLC's answer/responsive pleading is due by 7/2/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 18, 2019 (King, Steve)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Subpoena Returned Executed as to Singing River Hospital. (Mitchell, Meade)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Subpoena Returned Executed as to CHI St. Luke's Health. (Mitchell, Meade)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA on Singing River Hospital by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Duces Tecum to Singing River Hospital)(Mitchell, Meade)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA on CHI St. Luke's Health by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Duces Tecum to CHI St. Luke's Health)(Mitchell, Meade)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Edelbrock Corporation.(Mulholland, Daniel)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 6/18/2019 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Agreed Order of Dismissal of Plaintiffs' claims against CBS Corporation entered 5/21/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/10/2019 (SR)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Holley Performance Products, Inc..(Abdalla, Mary Clift)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by MW Custom Papers, LLC.(Smyth, John)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #266 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Edelbrock Corporation answer due 6/14/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 4, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Autozone, Inc..(Obert, Keith)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Perrigo Company.(Owen, Joe)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #251 Amended Complaint,, by Edelbrock Corporation (Krutz, Fred)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Caterpillar, Inc..(Rouse, John)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #251 Amended Complaint,, or file Responsive Pleadings by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Frederick, Zelma)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated.(Leggett, Joshua)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Partridge, Donald)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #264 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bosch Brake Components LLC answer due 6/18/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 3, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC.(Hays, Bradley)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #251 Amended Complaint,, by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Mitchell, Meade)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Ford Motor Company.(Polk, Janika)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #260 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Holley Performance Products, Inc. answer due 6/7/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on May 31, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Trinity Marine Products, Inc..(Wyly, James)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Markey Machinery Co. Inc..(Jones, Sarah)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust.(Hubbard, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ANSWER to #251 Amended Complaint,, by Honeywell International, Inc..(Mizell, Edward)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Summons Issued as to General Electric Company. (RLW)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Plaintiffs' claims against CBS Corporation. CBS Corporation (a Delaware Corporation, sued as successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation (a Pennsylvania Corporation)) terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 5/21/19. (Whitsitt, K)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Autozone, Inc., Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, Bosch Brake Components LLC, Caterpillar, Inc., Edelbrock Corporation, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Ford Motor Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Holley Performance Products, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., MW Custom Papers, LLC, Markey Machinery Co. Inc., Perrigo Company, Trinity Marine Products, Inc., General Electric Company, filed by William Dickens, Karla Dickens.(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting as unopposed #245 Motion for Leave to File amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on May 17, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #247: This document notices service of multiple forms of discovery. Each event should be separately docketed. The same PDF document may be used for all entries. Attorney is advised to docket additional events as needed. These events, Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Notice of Service of Request for Admissions, are found in the electronic docketing system under Discovery Documents. (RLW)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Request for Production by Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
May 12, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #245: Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (RLW)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MEMORANDUM in Support re #245 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Wathen - PHV, Frank)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wathen - PHV, Frank)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #218 Notice (Other), of Filing of J&J and JJCI Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy Under 28 U.S..C. 157(B)(5) and 1334(B) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #242 Notice (Other), #218 Notice (Other), filed by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit B-1989 Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-2001 Agreement, #4 Exhibit D-2015 Letter, #5 Exhibit E-Response to Plaintiff's Request for Disclosure, #6 Exhibit F-Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, #7 Exhibit G-Response to Standard Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit H-Responses to Standard Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit I-Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit J-Remand, #11 Exhibit K-Remand, #12 Exhibit L- Remand, #13 Exhibit M-Remand Order, #14 Exhibit N-Remand Order, #15 Exhibit O-Order Remanding Case)(McCormick, Cameron)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of Opposition by Karla Dickens, William Dickens re #218 Notice (Other), (McCormick, Cameron)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Frank J. Wathen $100.00, receipt number 14643011316 (RLW)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a three-week term of Court beginning on 9/8/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/26-27/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2019. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 5/10/2019. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 9/3/2019. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/24/2019. Motions due by 3/23/2020. Settlement Conference set for 5/27/2020 09:30 AM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) Walker before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. ADR Report due by 8/19/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2020. EDT: 12-20 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 5/2/2019 (SR)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 5/2/2019 with attorneys Frank J. Wathen - PHV, Keith D. Obert, Bradley Adam Hays, Zelma M. Frederick, John T. Rouse, Fred Krutz III, Jeffrey P. Hubbard, Janika D. Polk, Joshua A. Leggett, Mary Clift Abdalla, Meade W. Mitchell, Donald C. Partridge, Mary Margaret Gay, John Albert Smyth III, Ben F. Galloway III, Michael A. Pichini - PHV and Barbara L. Arras - PHV. (SR)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #239 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Frank J. Wathen shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the plaintiffs William Dickens and Karla Dickens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on May 1, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION for Frank J. Wathen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McCormick, Cameron)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE of Service of INITIAL DISCLOSURES Disclosure by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Crump, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #227: Incorrect event chosen. This docket entry should be disregarded. Attorney is directed to re-file using the correct event, Notice of Service of Disclosure, which is under Discovery Documents. (RLW)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #234: Incorrect event chosen and incorrect document attached. This docket entry should be disregarded. Attorney is directed to file a Notice of Service of Disclosure using the correct event, Notice of Service of Disclosure, which is under Discovery Documents. (RLW)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #235: Advising attorney that defendant's name should be listed in all future filed pleadings as it is listed on the docket, Edelbrock Corporation. If this name is incorrect, attorney is advised to file a Motion to Correct Name. (RLW)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Edelbrock Corporation (Mulholland, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karla Dickens, William Dickens Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Przybysz - PHV, Eric) Modified on 4/26/2019 (RLW).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Jones, Sarah)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures Disclosure by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by Perrigo Company (Galloway, Ben)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Wyly, James)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure by Autozone, Inc. (Obert, Keith)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure by MW Custom Papers, LLC (Smyth, John)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Crump, Richard) Modified on 4/26/2019 (RLW).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Wyly, James)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Frederick, Zelma)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a) Disclosure by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated (Leggett, Joshua)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Detroit Diesel Corporation (Polk, Janika)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Honeywell International, Inc. (Bolin, James)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Caterpillar, Inc. (Rouse, John)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy Under 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) and 1334(b) by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Fix Venue for claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy)(Mitchell, Meade)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #217 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kimberly Paige Mangum terminated as counsel for Markey Machinery Co. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on April 17, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kimberly P. Mangum by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Mangum, Kimberly)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #215 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ryan W. Blackney shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant Holley Performance Products, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on April 16, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION for Ryan W. Blackney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3967078) by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing)(Abdalla, Mary Clift)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Settlement as to Plaintiff and CBS Corporation only as per email received from attorney Rose Marie Wade, counsel for CBS Corporation. Counsel are to submit an agreed order of dismissal as to this claim to Judge Guirola no later than May 20, 2019. (SR)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 6/18/2019 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Walker's chambers with counsel for CBS Corporation on the line. (SR)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Agreed ORDER granting #213 Motion to Dismiss A-1 Auto Parts & Repair. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 4/8/19. (Whitsitt, K)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by A-1 Auto Parts & Repair, Inc. (Adams - PHV, Jennifer)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #212: Incorrect document attached. Motion terminated by court staff. Attorney is directed to refile and attach the correct pdf document. (RLW)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by A-1 Auto Parts & Repair, Inc. (Adams - PHV, Jennifer) Modified on 4/8/2019 (RLW).
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A. Leggett on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Incorporated (Leggett, Joshua)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2019 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #184 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff granted 14 days to amend. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/11/2019 (Guirola, Louis)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #179 Motion to Dismiss Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 02/08/2019 (Guirola, Louis)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA UPON BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Attachments: #1 A - SDT - Baylor College of Medicine)(Strain, Stacey)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA UPON CHI ST. LUKE'S - BAYLOR ST. LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena Duces Tecum to CHI St. Luke's - Baylor St. Luke's Medical Center)(Strain, Stacey)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey L. Strain on behalf of Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Strain, Stacey)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #203 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims against Union Carbide Corporation. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 1/7/19 (Whitsitt, K)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Union Carbide Corporation, only by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. The Telephonic Case Management Conference will be rescheduled after the Court rules on MOTION #184 to Dismiss filed by A-1 Auto Parts & Repair, Inc. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 11/29/2018 (SR)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DANA COMPANIES, LLC. Dana Companies LLC (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Victor Gasket Manufacturing Company) terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/28/18 (Whitsitt, K)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO VELAN VALVE CORP., Velan Valve Corporation terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/27/18 (Whitsitt, K)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Plaintiffs' claims against Viking Pump, Inc. Defendant Viking Pump, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/21/18 (Whitsitt, K)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Service of Bankruptcy Claims Disclosure by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Disclosure of Bankruptcy Claims)(Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting #196 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on November 19, 2018 (King, Steve)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION for Amber Barlow to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3858080) by Detroit Diesel Corporation, Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ziffer, Lee)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiffs claims against Bell Auto Part, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice; and plaintiffs are granted 14 days from the date of this Order to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint, attaching the proposed amended complaint as an exhibit. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 11/2/18. (RLW)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #148 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Plaintiff's claims against this defendant are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 11/2/18. (RLW)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. MOTION to Amend/Correct #90 Answer to Complaint by Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee) Modified on 11/2/2018 (RLW).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #191 Motion to Amend/Correct Answer of Ford Motor Company. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on November 2, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #191: L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description (Exhibit was not described). Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. Also, the court style and case number on Ex. A are incorrect. Attorney is advised to make corrections before filing the Amended Answer to Complaint. (RLW)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #192: Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. Amended Answer to Complaint was inadvertently filed as a Motion. Motion has been terminated by court staff. Attorney is advised to re-file using the event code "Amended Answer to Complaint" which is under Other Answers. Attorney is also advised to correct the court style and case number. (RLW)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MOTION to Amend/Correct #90 Answer to Complaint by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ziffer, Lee)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #89 Motion to Dismiss certain claims against Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/1/18 (Whitsitt, K)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 AGREED ORDER dismissing claims against General Parts, Inc. General Parts, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 11/1/18. (Whitsitt, K)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 AGREED ORDER dismissing claims against Advance Auto Parts, Inc. Advance Auto Parts, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 11/1/18. (Whitsitt, K)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #146 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The claims against these parties have been dismissed by agreement. See August 7, 2018 Agreed Order at docket entry 168. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 11/1/18 (Whitsitt, K)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER: Ordered that plaintiffs' claims against Teikoku USA, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Teikoku USA Inc. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Chempump Company) terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 10/31/18. (RLW)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #183 Motion to Withdraw #176 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Detroit Diesel Corporation. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/30/18 (Whitsitt, K)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #186: Incorrect event chosen. The event code "Summons Returned Executed" should have been used. Only the summons with completed affidavit/proof of service should have been filed. Summonses with the same service date could have been scanned in together. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER withdrawing #176 Motion for Default Judgment. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/30/18 (Whitsitt, K)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by William Dickens as to All Defendants. (Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #184: L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. The exhibit letter should have been included in the description box and for Exhibit B, the word Exhibit should have been selected from the category box. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (RLW)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of an answer, Based on its Status ans an Innocent Seller by A-1 Auto Parts & Repair, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Petition, #2 Affidavit Sheila M. Turner)(Adams - PHV, Jennifer)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION to Withdraw #177 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #176 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Detroit Diesel Corporation by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Detroit Diesel Corporation (Ziffer, Lee)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Detroit Diesel Corporation (Ziffer, Lee)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 178 and # 180. Attorney is advised that these documents were filed using the incorrect event. The correct event that should have been chosen is "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)", which can be found under the "Other Answers" category. Attorney is not required to re-file. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 179. Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. (JCH)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Detroit Diesel Corporation.(Ziffer, Lee)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) Certain Causes of Action in Plaintiffs Complain by Detroit Diesel Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Ziffer, Lee)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Detroit Diesel Corporation.(Ziffer, Lee)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM in Support re #176 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Detroit Diesel Corporation filed by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ROS_Detroit Diesel)(Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Detroit Diesel Corporation by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Response to Order re #173 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By 10/25/2018, Plaintiffs shall show good cause, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed as to Defendants Detroit Diesel Corporation and Teikoku USA Inc., for failure to serve process as required by the Rules. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 10, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry) filed by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Response to Order re #173 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By 10/25/2018, Plaintiffs shall show good cause, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed as to Defendants Detroit Diesel Corporation and Teikoku USA Inc., for failure to serve process as required by the Rules. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 10, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry) filed by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 ROS_Detroit Diesel, #2 Exhibit 2 Original Complaint_Dickens, #3 Exhibit 3 William Dickens Video Deposition, #4 Exhibit 4 William Dickens Discovery Deposition)(Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By 10/25/2018, Plaintiffs shall show good cause, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed as to Defendants Detroit Diesel Corporation and Teikoku USA Inc., for failure to serve process as required by the Rules. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 10, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #171 Agreed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Crane Co. with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/9/18 (Whitsitt, K)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Crane Co. by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #169 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jennifer E. Adams shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant A-1 Auto Parts & Repair, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 14, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION for Jennifer E. Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3780726) by A-1 Auto Parts & Repair, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- LA Bar Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Supreme Court Certificate)(Vaughn, Ross)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company (sued individually, doing business as, and as successor to American Talc Company, Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company) and Imerys Talc America, Inc. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Luzenac America, Inc. successor-in-interest to Cyprus Industrial Minerals Company and Windsor Minerals, Inc. and Metropolitan Talc Co.). Cyprus Amax Minerals Company and Imerys Talc America, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 8/7/18 (Whitsitt, K)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #166 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney John T. Rouse for Caterpillar, Inc. Attorneys Samuel D. Habeeb and Colleen S. Welch terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 31, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Caterpillar, Inc. (Habeeb, Samuel)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #164: This document is not signed in compliance with the court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.D.1. which pertains to both civil and criminal pleadings. Attorney is advised that future filed documents with handwritten signatures will be disregarded and attorney will be required to re-file. (RLW)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #166: This document requests several motion reliefs. Every motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to re-file. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (RLW)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE to Withdraw by Caterpillar, Inc. re #163 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Habeeb, Samuel)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Eaton Hydraulics LLC (Adams, Clyde)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Caterpillar, Inc. (Habeeb, Samuel)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating #163 Motion to Substitute Attorney pursuant to #165 movant's notice of withdrawal of motion #163 . NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 30, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL of plaintiffs' claims against John Crane, Inc., without prejudice. John Crane, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 7/23/18 (Whitsitt, K)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO BALDOR ELECTRIC COMPANY. The plaintiffs' claims against Baldor Electric Company are dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 7/12/2018. (BR)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO GARDNER DENVER, INC. The plaintiffs' claims against Gardner Denver, Inc., are hereby dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 7/10/2018. (BR)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #159: Based on the title of this document and case law, the event code "Rebuttal" should have been used. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RESPONSE in Support re #148 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Affidavit of Tina Snyder French)(Carrington, Kathleen)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 AGREED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE in favor of William Powell Company against Karla Dickens, William Dickens. William Powell Company terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 7/3/18 (Whitsitt, K)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 RESPONSE to Motion re #148 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - J&J Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories)(Przybysz - PHV, Eric)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE in favor of Joy Global Surface Mining Inc. against Karla Dickens and William Dickens. Joy Global Surface Mining Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 6/29/18 (Whitsitt, K)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL without prejudice in favor of Konecranes, Inc. against Karla Dickens and William Dickens. Konecranes, Inc. (sued individually) terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 6/29/18 (Whitsitt, K)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ANSWER to Complaint by Autozone, Inc..(Obert, Keith)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith D. Obert on behalf of Autozone, Inc. (Obert, Keith)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #153 and #154: These documents are not signed in compliance with the court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.D.1. which pertains to both civil and criminal pleadings. In the future, documents filed with handwritten signatures will be disregarded and attorney will be required to re-file with electronic signatures. DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #154: Incorrect event code was used. This case was removed from state court, therefore, the event code "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)" should have been used. This event code is under Other Answers. Attorney is advised to use the event code in the future when filing an Answer for cases removed from state court. (RLW)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Desiree W. Adams - PHV on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc. (Adams - PHV, Desiree)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula M. Wellons - PHV on behalf of Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc. (Wellons - PHV, Paula)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 AGREED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), in favor of Manitowoc Company, Inc. against Karla Dickens, William Dickens. Manitowoc Company, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 6/25/18 (Whitsitt, K)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #151 and #152: Advising PHV Attorneys Paula Wellons and Desiree Adams that the Notices of Appearance should not have been filed. PHV attorneys are added to a case by court staff. Attorneys were added on 6/18/18. (RLW)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM in Support re #148 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Johnson & Johnson (Mitchell, Meade)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Tina Snyder French)(Mitchell, Meade)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM in Support re #146 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Patrick J. Downey)(Robinson, Benjamin)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc. (Robinson, Benjamin)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael O'Mara Gwin on behalf of Advance Auto Parts, Inc., General Parts, Inc. (Gwin, Michael)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #139 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jose L. Barro, III shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant Bosch Brake Components LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 19, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #137 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jeffrey Jerome Hines shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant Perrigo Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 19, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company, Viking Pump, Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanette S. Riggins on behalf of Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Riggins, Jeanette)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanette S. Riggins on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Riggins, Jeanette)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #138: Scanned document contains blank page(s). PDF documents should be checked for errors before filing. It is not necessary to re-file. (RLW)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #147: L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description (Exhibit number was not included in the description box). Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (RLW)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #135 and #137: Advising attorney that on page 1 of the Motions, Defendant's name, Perrigo Company is listed incorrect and should be listed as it was filed in the Complaint/Notice of Removal. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION for Jose L. Barro, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3738117) by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Frederick, Zelma)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen E. Graham on behalf of Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Graham, Allen)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION for Jeffrey Jerome Hines to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3737738) by Perrigo Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Owen, Joe)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Deirdre C. McGlinchey, $ 100, receipt number 34643050591. (ND)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Paula M. Wellons receipt number 0538-3737410 $ 100 (Robinson, Benjamin)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Desiree W. Adams receipt number 0538-3737422 $ 100 (Robinson, Benjamin)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #135 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Richard M. Barnes shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant Perrigo Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 15, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION for Richard Matthew Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3736747) by Perrigo Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Owen, Joe)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #128 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Dierdre C. McGlinchey shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant Bosch Brake Components LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 15, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #132 Joint Motion to Dismiss CARQUEST Corporation. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 6/15/18 (Whitsitt, K)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Carquest Corporation (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Dickens by Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Parts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Corporate Parent General Parts International, Inc., Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc. for General Parts, Inc.. (Ireland, Robert)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advance Auto Parts, Inc. (Ireland, Robert)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION for Deirdre C. McGlinchey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Frederick, Zelma)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher O. Massenburg on behalf of Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Massenburg, Christopher)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher O. Massenburg on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Massenburg, Christopher)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Goggans on behalf of Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Goggans, Michael)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Goggans on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Goggans, Michael)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael A. Pichini shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant Perrigo Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 14, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. John M. Fitzpatrick shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant Crane Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 14, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #118 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #119 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Desiree W. Adams and Paula M. Wellons shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendants Cyprus Amax Minerals Company and Imerys Talc America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 14, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for John M. Fitzpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3734199) by Crane Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Melchi, Kevin)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for Paula M. Wellons to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing LA State Court, #2 Exhibit B Paula Wellons - Supreme Court of LA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Georgia)(Robinson, Benjamin)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Desiree W. Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from LA State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing LA Supreme Court)(Robinson, Benjamin)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of plaintiffs' claims against Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 6/13/18 (Whitsitt, K)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of plaintiffs' claims against Brenntag Specialties, Inc. Brenntag Specialties Inc., f/k/a Mineral and Pigment Solutions Inc.(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.) terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 6/13/18 (Whitsitt, K)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of plaintiffs' claims against Brenntag North America, Inc. Brenntag North America, Inc.(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc. and as successor-in-interest to Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.) terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 6/13/18 (Whitsitt, K)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION for Michael A. Pichini to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3733392) by Perrigo Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Owen, Joe)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #32 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The claims against these movants have been dismissed by agreement of the parties. See docket entries 115-117. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 6/13/18 (Whitsitt, K)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Perrigo Company identifying Corporate Parent Perrigo Company plc for Perrigo Company. (Owen, Joe)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Perrigo Company (Owen, Joe)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben F. Galloway, III on behalf of Perrigo Company (Galloway, Ben)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Sam Owen on behalf of Perrigo Company (Owen, Joe)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Bolin on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Bolin, James)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Bolin on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Bolin, James)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Advance Auto Parts, Inc. (Ireland, Robert)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by General Parts, Inc. (Ireland, Robert)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bosch Brake Components LLC identifying Corporate Parent Robert Bosch LLC for Bosch Brake Components LLC. (Frederick, Zelma)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Frederick, Zelma)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eaton Hydraulics LLC identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation for Eaton Hydraulics LLC. (Adams, Clyde)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Clift Abdalla on behalf of Holley Performance Products, Inc. (Abdalla, Mary Clift)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Barbara L. Arras $100.00, receipt number 14643010375 (RLW)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #96 and #97: Attorneys Christopher O. Massenburg, Jeanette S. Riggins, and Michael D. Goggans must also file the same Notice of Appearance using their login. (RLW)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Eric Przybysz $100.00, receipt number 14643010377 (RLW)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc. (Hays, Bradley)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Adam Hays on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Hays, Bradley)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Adam Hays on behalf of Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC (Hays, Bradley)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #94 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Barbara L. Arras shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the defendant Trinity Marine Products, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 7, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION for Barbara L. Arras to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Wyly, James)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah D. Kuchler on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Kuchler, Deborah)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Blanton Ziffer on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Ziffer, Lee)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Support re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Causes of Action filed by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Original Complaint)(Polk, Janika)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Polk, Janika)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Causes of Action by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit A)(Polk, Janika)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Janika D. Polk on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Polk, Janika)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #90: Incorrect event code was used. This case was removed from state court, therefore, the event code "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)" should have been used. This event code is under Other Answers. Attorney is advised to use the event code in the future when filing an Answer for cases removed from state court. (RLW)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #87: Attorneys Deborah D. Kuchler and Lee B. Ziffer must also file this Notice of Appearance using their login. (RLW)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #89: (1) Memorandum was incorrectly attached as an exhibit. Memorandum in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. The event code is under Responses and Replies; and (2) L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description (Exhibit was not described). Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (RLW)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ANSWER to Complaint by Eaton Hydraulics LLC.(Adams, Clyde)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #86: Incorrect event code was used. This case was removed from state court, therefore, the event code "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)" should have been used. This event code is under Other Answers. Attorney is advised to use the event code in the future when filing an Answer for cases removed from state court. (RLW)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Eric Przybysz shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the plaintiffs William Dickens and Karla Dickens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 1, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #84: Motion for PHV and exhibit are filed as one main document. Exhibits should be scanned separately and docketed as properly identified attachments to the main document within the same docket entry. Attorney is directed to follow this procedure in future filings. L.U.Civ.R. 7.(b)(2). (RLW)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Eric Przybysz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (McCormick, Cameron)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Jones on behalf of Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Jones, Sarah)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Jones on behalf of Baldor Electric Company (Jones, Sarah)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Jones on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Jones, Sarah)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #80: This document requests several motion reliefs. Every motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to re-file. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (RLW)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #80 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Cameron M. McCormick for Karla Dickens,Cameron M. McCormick for William Dickens. Attorney William Charles McVea terminated. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on May 29, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney William Charles McVea by Karla Dickens, William Dickens (McVea, William)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Paige Mangum on behalf of Baldor Electric Company (Mangum, Kimberly)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Paige Mangum on behalf of Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Mangum, Kimberly)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Paige Mangum on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Mangum, Kimberly)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MW Custom Papers, LLC (Smyth, John)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by John Albert Smyth, III on behalf of MW Custom Papers, LLC (Smyth, John)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #72 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File answer/response to complaint; granting #73 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File answer/response to complaint. Imerys Talc America, Inc. answer due 6/22/2018; Cyprus Amax Minerals Company answer due 6/22/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on May 24, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry) Modified on 5/24/2018 (Joffe, Scherry).
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company answer due 6/22/2018; Imerys Talc America, Inc. answer due 6/22/2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carquest Corporation identifying Corporate Parent North Carolina Atlantic Holdings LLC for Carquest Corporation. (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company (Robinson, Benjamin)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Imerys Talc America, Inc. (Robinson, Benjamin)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #64 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Advance Auto Parts, Inc. answer due 6/11/2018; granting #65 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - General Parts, Inc. answer due 6/11/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on May 22, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brenntag Specialties, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Brenntag North America Inc. for Brenntag Specialties, Inc.. (Crump, Richard)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brenntag North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Brenntag (Holding) BV for Brenntag North America, Inc.. (Crump, Richard)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Crump on behalf of Brenntag North America, Inc. (Crump, Richard)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Hubbard on behalf of Carquest Corporation (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Hubbard on behalf of Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Hubbard, Jeffrey)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer of General Parts, Inc. by General Parts, Inc. (Ireland, Robert)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer of Advance Auto Parts, Inc. by Advance Auto Parts, Inc. (Ireland, Robert)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. (Melchi, Kevin)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Crane Co..(Melchi, Kevin)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #57: The defendant's name in the title is incorrect. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #62: Incorrect event code was used. This case was removed from state court, therefore, the event code "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)" should have been used. This event code is under Other Answers. Attorney is advised to use the event code in the future when filing an Answer for cases removed from state court. (RLW)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation (Rush, Clare)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Rush on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Rush, Clare)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcy B. Croft on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Croft, Marcy)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Dana Companies LLC (Croft, Marcy)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dana Companies LLC (Rush, Clare)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcy B. Croft on behalf of Dana Companies LLC (Croft, Marcy)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Rush on behalf of Dana Companies LLC (Rush, Clare)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Wyly, III on behalf of Trinity Marine Products, Inc. (Wyly, James)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 State Court Record by Defendant CBS Corporation Volumes 1 (Wade, Rose)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Leland Redfearn, Jr on behalf of William Powell Company (Redfearn, Robert)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #40: Incorrect event code was used. This case was removed from state court, therefore, the event code "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)" should have been used. This event code is under Other Answers. Attorney is advised to use the event code in the future when filing an Answer for cases removed from state court; and DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #40 and #41: Advising attorney that defendant's name must listed in all future filed pleadings as it was filed in the complaint. (RLW)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #54: Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry. Page 3 of the Notice should be disregarded. (RLW)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #34: Advising attorney that defendant's name must listed in all future filed pleadings as it was filed in the complaint. (RLW)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson (Mitchell, Meade)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Crump on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Crump, Richard)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation. (Rush, Clare)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Rush on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Rush, Clare)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W. Mizell on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mizell, Edward)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Crump, Richard)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Crump on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Crump, Richard)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald C. Partridge on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (Partridge, Donald)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen I. Carrington on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Carrington, Kathleen)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION TO ALL COUNSEL: Each Defendant's name must be listed in all future filed pleadings as it was filed in the lower court complaint. If the party's name is incorrect, attorney is advised to file a Motion to Change Name.(RLW)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Edelbrock Corporation (Mulholland, Daniel)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint by Edelbrock Corporation.(Mulholland, Daniel)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Mitchell, Meade)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Krutz, III on behalf of Edelbrock Corporation (Krutz, Fred)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Mulholland on behalf of Edelbrock Corporation (Mulholland, Daniel)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnson & Johnson (Mitchell, Meade)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Baldor Electric Company (Gay, Mary Margaret)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Manitowoc Company, Inc. (Buchanan, Patrick)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Brenntag Specialties, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - William Dickens Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Brad Owens)(Crump, Richard)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Brenntag Specialties, Inc. (Crump, Richard)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Soco West, Inc., Corporate Parent Brilliant National Services, Inc. for Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Crump, Richard)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - William Dickens Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Dennis St. George)(Crump, Richard)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Crump, Richard)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Gay, Mary)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Markey Machinery Co. Inc. (Gay, Mary)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer w/Certificate of Service by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Frederick, Zelma)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gardner Denver Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate KKR & Co. L.P. for Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Gay, Mary)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Gay, Mary)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12 and #13: Advising attorney that defendant's name must listed in all future filed pleadings as it was filed in the complaint. (RLW)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #26 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bosch Brake Components LLC answer due 6/8/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on May 16, 2018. (Joffe, Scherry)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Melchi on behalf of Crane Co. (Melchi, Kevin)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Wilkinson on behalf of Crane Co. (Wilkinson, Robert)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump, Inc. (Crump, Richard)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen S. Welch on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Welch, Colleen)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc. (Welch, Colleen)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Caterpillar, Inc. (Habeeb, Samuel)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Paige Mangum on behalf of Joy Global Surface Mining Inc. (Mangum, Kimberly)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Paige Mangum on behalf of Konecranes, Inc. (Mangum, Kimberly)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joy Global Surface Mining Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Komatsu Mining Corp., Other Affiliate Komatsu America Corp., Other Affiliate Komatsu Ltd. for Joy Global Surface Mining Inc.. (Habeeb, Samuel)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Joy Global Surface Mining Inc. (Habeeb, Samuel)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated (Studebaker, Jennifer)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Studebaker on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Incorporated (Studebaker, Jennifer)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9: Incorrect event code was used. This case was removed from state court, therefore, the event code "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)" should have been used. This event code is under Other Answers. Attorney is advised to use the event code in the future when filing an Answer for cases removed from state court. (RLW)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc. (Mizell, Edward)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation (Wade, Rose)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Honeywell International, Inc..(Mizell, Edward)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Konecranes, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Konecranes PLC for Konecranes, Inc.. (Habeeb, Samuel)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Konecranes, Inc. (Habeeb, Samuel)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Konecranes, Inc. (Habeeb, Samuel) Modified on 5/11/2018 (RLW).
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint and All Cross-Claims by Konecranes, Inc..(Habeeb, Samuel) Modified on 5/11/2018 (RLW).
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss , in Lieu of an Answer, Based on Its Status as an Innocent Seller by Bell Auto Parts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of C. Stewart)(Studebaker, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell Auto Parts, Inc. (Studebaker, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Studebaker on behalf of Bell Auto Parts, Inc. (Studebaker, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 and #6: These documents were filed incorrect and should be disregarded. (1} The judge assignment of LG-RHW should be included after the case number; (2) In re to #5, the incorrect event code was used. Attorney is advised to re-file and used the event "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal). This event code is under Other Answers. Also, attorney should check box, when prompted, that this Answer includes a Cross-Claim and follow additional instructions; and (3) In re to #6, the incorrect event code was used and incorrect pdf document was attached. Attorney is advised to re-file using the event code Notice of Service of Disclosure and attach the actual Notice. This event code is under Discovery Documents. (RLW)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6: If a Corporate Disclosure Statement is to be filed, attorney is advised to use the same pdf document, with judge's initials added, and use the event code Corporate Disclosure Statement. (RLW)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS Corporation from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Mississippi, case number CI 2018-001, with jury demand in lower court. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-3709075) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickens et al v. Autozone, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dickens
Represented By: William Charles McVea
Represented By: Cameron M. McCormick
Represented By: Frank J. Wathen - PHV
Represented By: Eric Przybysz - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Dickens
Represented By: William Charles McVea
Represented By: Cameron M. McCormick
Represented By: Frank J. Wathen - PHV
Represented By: Eric Przybysz - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Paige Mangum
Represented By: Sarah E. Jones
Represented By: Mary Margaret Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carquest Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Desiree W. Adams - PHV
Represented By: Benjamin Lyle Robinson
Represented By: Paula M. Wellons - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Michael D. Goggans
Represented By: Jeanette S. Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Represented By: Donald C. Partridge
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konecranes, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Paige Mangum
Represented By: Samuel D. Habeeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Amber Barlow - PHV
Represented By: John R. Henderson - PHV
Represented By: Skylar B. Rudin - PHV
Represented By: Deborah D. Kuchler
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: Robert Leland Redfearn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: John M. Fitzpatrick - PHV
Represented By: Kevin M. Melchi
Represented By: Robert W. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Diesel Corporation
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Represented By: Amber Barlow - PHV
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldor Electric Company
Represented By: Kimberly Paige Mangum
Represented By: Sarah E. Jones
Represented By: Mary Margaret Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Represented By: Keith D. Obert
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW Custom Papers, LLC
Represented By: John Albert Smyth, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Meade W. Mitchell
Represented By: James H. Bolin
Represented By: Edward W. Mizell
Represented By: Kathleen I. Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Global Surface Mining Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Paige Mangum
Represented By: Samuel D. Habeeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Company
Represented By: Joe Sam Owen
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Hines - PHV
Represented By: Ben F. Galloway, III
Represented By: Richard Matthew Barnes - PHV
Represented By: Mitchell Lance Owen
Represented By: Michael A. Pichini - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Marcy B. Croft
Represented By: Clare Smith Millette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: Joshua A. Leggett
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Studebaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edelbrock Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Mulholland
Represented By: Fred Krutz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holley Performance Products, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Clift Abdalla
Represented By: Ryan W. Blackney - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosch Brake Components LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Hubbard
Represented By: Jose L. Barro - PHV, III
Represented By: Zelma M. Frederick
Represented By: Deirdre C. McGlinchey - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 Auto Parts & Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Douglas Vaughn
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Desiree W. Adams - PHV
Represented By: Benjamin Lyle Robinson
Represented By: Paula M. Wellons - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manitowoc Company, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick R. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: James H. Bolin
Represented By: Edward W. Mizell
Represented By: Meade W. Mitchell
Represented By: Kevin P. Greene - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Meade W. Mitchell
Represented By: James H. Bolin
Represented By: Edward W. Mizell
Represented By: Kathleen I. Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Michael D. Goggans
Represented By: Jeanette S. Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Marine Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Hubbard
Represented By: James G. Wyly, III
Represented By: Christine Bocek Whitman
Represented By: Barbara L. Arras - PHV
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teikoku USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Rose Marie Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Hubbard
Represented By: Colleen S. Welch
Represented By: Samuel D. Habeeb
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Auto Parts, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Ireland, III
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Parts, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Ireland, III
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Hydraulics LLC
Represented By: Clyde O. Adams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Auto Parts, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Studebaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markey Machinery Co. Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Hubbard
Represented By: Kimberly Paige Mangum
Represented By: Sarah E. Jones
Represented By: Mary Margaret Gay
Represented By: Joanna B. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Marcy B. Croft
Represented By: Clare Smith Millette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Represented By: Stacey L. Strain
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Clare Smith Millette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Auto Parts, Inc. doing business as Carquest
Represented By: Robert B. Ireland, III
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konecranes, Inc. sued individually doing business as Kranco Crane Services Inc. doing business as Crane Pro Parts
Represented By: Kimberly Paige Mangum
Represented By: Samuel D. Habeeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&H Mining Equipment Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Paige Mangum
Represented By: Samuel D. Habeeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Rose Marie Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Rose Marie Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company sued individually, doing business as, and as successor to American Talc Company, Metropolitan Talc Co. Inc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company
Represented By: Desiree W. Adams - PHV
Represented By: Benjamin Lyle Robinson
Represented By: Paula M. Wellons - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Hydraulics, Inc.
Represented By: Clyde O. Adams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Parts, Inc. doing business as Carquest Auto Parts, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Ireland, III
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal, Inc.
Represented By: James H. Bolin
Represented By: Edward W. Mizell
Represented By: Meade W. Mitchell
Represented By: Kevin P. Greene - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?