Boudreaux v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Monica Boudreaux
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00294
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE UPON CONSENT. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball for all further proceedings. District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 11/2/18. (RLW)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (RLW)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Monica Boudreaux. (RLW)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Filing of Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/15/2018. (JEJ)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration (RLW)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-3802164), filed by Monica Boudreaux (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Boudreaux
Represented By: Richard Scott Pietrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?