Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Plaintiff: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00321
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on November 20, 2018 (King, Steve)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company (Coleman, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Emily J. Bogenschutz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3857745) by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - TX State Bar, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - TX Supreme Ct)(Wilkins, Jimmy)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Jack E. Little, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3857738) by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing TX State Bar, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - TX Supreme Ct)(Wilkins, Jimmy)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmy B. Wilkins on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Wilkins, Jimmy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Ayers, David)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Ayers, David)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, filed by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company.(Warren, James)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H. Coleman on behalf of Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company (Coleman, Christopher)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Warren, James)
October 5, 2018 Remark: Original Summons mailed to attorney via regular us mail for service. (RLW)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (RLW)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, jury demand, against Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-3826576), filed by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company v. Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: James L. Warren, III
Represented By: Christopher H. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: David L. Ayers
Represented By: Jack E. Little - PHV, Jr
Represented By: Jimmy B. Wilkins
Represented By: Emily J. Bogenschutz - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?