PF3 Global, LLC v. Forterra Pipe & Precast, LLC et al

Plaintiff: PF3 Global, LLC
Defendant: Forterra Pipe & Precast, LLC and Kenneth Simon
Case Number: 1:2018cv00331
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 12/12/2018 (King, Steve)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion to Extend November 12, 2018 Deadline for Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants' answers due by 12/12/2018. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on November 9, 2018 (King, Steve)
November 8, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 7. This docket entry fails to select all filing parties. Clerks office will edit this docket entry to include all appropriate filing parties. Attorney is directed to select all filing parties in future filings. (JCH)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Extend November 12, 2018 Deadline for Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Forterra Pipe & Precast, LLC, Kenneth Simon (Manuel, J.) Modified to add filer on 11/8/2018 (JCH).
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J. William Manuel on behalf of Forterra Pipe & Precast, LLC (Manuel, J.)
November 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 4. Service date was set incorrectly in summons entry, per the proof of service attached. The date served is 10/22/18, not 10/19/18. Clerk's Office has reset the answer due date to 11/13/18. Attorney does not need to re-file. (JCH)
November 2, 2018 Reset Answer Due Date: Forterra Pipe & Precast, LLC answer due 11/13/2018. Service date was set incorrectly in summons returned executed entry #4 . (JCH)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PF3 Global, LLC. Kenneth Simon served on 10/27/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Brady, William)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PF3 Global, LLC. Forterra Pipe & Precast, LLC served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Brady, William)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAILING OF Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (JCH)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Forterra Pipe & Precast, LLC, Kenneth Simon. (JCH)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forterra Pipe & Precast, LLC, Kenneth Simon (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 14643010742), filed by PF3 Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Application issued to Pat Holton Fore, III, #3 Exhibit B - Application issued to Pat Holton Fore, III, #4 Exhibit C - Filing Receipt, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Allowance, #6 Exhibit E - Filing Receipt, #7 Exhibit F - Filing Receipt, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Allowance, #9 Exhibit H - photo of precast pipe, #10 Exhibit I - photos of Forterra Lifting Pipe, #11 Exhibit J - photo of precast pipe, #12 Exhibit K - NDA, #13 Exhibit L - non-binding indication of interest, #14 Exhibit M - Confidentiality Agreement)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PF3 Global, LLC v. Forterra Pipe & Precast, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF3 Global, LLC
Represented By: William Alex Brady, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forterra Pipe & Precast, LLC
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Simon
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?