United States of America v. $7,605.70 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $7,605.70 United States Currency
Interested Party: Saeed Tariq
Case Number: 1:2018cv00348
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1355
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8: Advising attorney that based on the docket entry, this document should have been titled "Motion for a Stay of Proceedings." Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by United States of America (Perez-Federal Gov, Marc)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 CLAIM by Saeed Tariq. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Saeed Tariq. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(PKS)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest In Rem Issued as to $7,605.70 United States Currency. (PKS)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America (Perez-Federal Gov, Marc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America (Perez-Federal Gov, Marc)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $7,605.70 United States Currency, filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Verified Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $7,605.70 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,605.70 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Marc A. Perez-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Saeed Tariq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?