Harris v. Favre et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Charles Harris
Defendant: Casey Favre, Ken Rogers, Sam Scaffidi and Brandon Zeringue
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv00349
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #6 Order to Show Cause. Mail sent to Daniel Charles Harris (wld)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 1/8/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/18/2018 (wld)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #4 Order, Mail sent to Daniel Charles Harris, #K4466, Pearl River County Jail, 200 South Main Street, Poplarville MS 39470. (wld)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Clerk is directed to edit the docket to reflect the Plaintiff's address of record is the Pearl River County Jail, 200 South Main St., Poplarville, MS 39470. On or before 12/4/18, Plaintiff shall file a written response to provide current mailing address for the record in this case. Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the Pearl River County Jail and to the address of 401 White Sand Rd. Poplarville, MS 39470. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/19/18 (PKS)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate by Authorized Officer that applicant has the sum of $10.08 on account (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JCH)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Daniel Charles Harris (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Casey Favre, Ken Rogers, Sam Scaffidi, Brandon Zeringue, filed by Daniel Charles Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Favre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Favre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Scaffidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Zeringue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Charles Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?