Bishop Insurance Agency LLC v. Bishop Insurance Services PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Bishop Insurance Agency LLC
Defendant: Amy B. Coakley and Bishop Insurance Services PLLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00350
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bishop Insurance Services PLLC (Burrow, Stephen)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Bishop Insurance Services PLLC, Amy B. Coakley.(Burrow, Stephen)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Additional Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 12/12/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/29/2018 (AG)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Bishop Insurance Services PLLC, Amy B. Coakley (Burrow, Stephen)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Burrow on behalf of Bishop Insurance Services PLLC, Amy B. Coakley (Burrow, Stephen)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas S. Keaty. Thomas S. Keaty is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Plaintiff Bishop Insurance Agency LLC in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/13/2018 (AB)
November 8, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Thomas S. Keaty $100.00, receipt number 14643010818 (RLW)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Thomas S. Keaty to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bishop Insurance Agency LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Certificate of Good Standing)(Healy, George)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Insurance Agency LLC. Amy B. Coakley served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Healy, George)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bishop Insurance Agency LLC. Bishop Insurance Services PLLC served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Healy, George)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bishop Insurance Agency LLC (Healy, George)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAILING OF Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (JCH)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bishop Insurance Services PLLC, Amy B. Coakley. (RLW)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Bishop Insurance Services PLLC, Amy B. Coakley (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 14643010798), filed by Bishop Insurance Agency LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Service Mark Application, #2 Exhibit B - Federal Service Mark Application, #3 Exhibit C - Screen Capture of the Homepage, #4 Exhibit D - Business Card, #5 Exhibit E - Printout of Business Details, #6 Exhibit F - Printout of State Registration's Details, #7 Exhibit G - Printout of Business Details, #8 Exhibit H - Screen Capture of Homepage, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop Insurance Agency LLC v. Bishop Insurance Services PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy B. Coakley
Represented By: Stephen W. Burrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishop Insurance Services PLLC
Represented By: Stephen W. Burrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bishop Insurance Agency LLC
Represented By: George W. Healy, IV
Represented By: Thomas S. Keaty - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?