Vega v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Brandi F. Vega
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00395
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Michael T Parker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 2, 2019 (KPM)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David F. Chermol is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 2, 2019 (KPM) Modified on 1/2/2019 (KPM).
December 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4: Advising attorney that the Certificates of Good Standing should not have been scanned it with the motion. The COGS should have been scanned separately and attached as an exhibit. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 First MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3883781) by Brandi F. Vega (Varnado, Mager)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on December 18, 2018. (js)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandi F. Vega (RLW)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Brandi F. Vega (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi F. Vega
Represented By: Mager A. Varnado, Jr.
Represented By: David F. Chermol - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?