Rogers v. Hood et al
Plaintiff: Fennon Rogers
Defendant: Jim Hood and Patrick Beasley
Case Number: 1:2018cv00399
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
2 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Parties should use the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials on future filings. 1:18cv399HSO-RHW. (wld)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker for all further proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 2/13/2019 (wld)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 Response to Order re #4 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to File a Written Response Providing a Basis for Federal Subject Matter Jurisdiction. filed by Fennon Rogers (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments)(wld)
February 13, 2019 Filing fee paid by Fennon Rogers: $ 400.00, receipt number 14643011061 (wld)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Lydia White aka Lydia Schultz filed by Fennon Rogers (wld)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT/CONTINUATION re #1 Complaint by Fennon Rogers (wld)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt by certified mail of document #3 & #4 by Fennon Rogers. (wld)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to File a Written Response Providing a Basis for Federal Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's deadline for filing a written response is 2/13/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/28/19 (HM) (wld).
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 1/28/19 (HM) Modified on 1/28/2019 (HM).
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fennon Rogers (wld)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Patrick Beasley, Jim Hood, filed by Fennon Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Assignment)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Hood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fennon Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?