Linson v. State of Mississippi

Plaintiff: Gregory Linson
Defendant: State of Mississippi and Unknown Taylor
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: F Keith Ball
1 Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Attachment of Ineffective Assistance of Both Trial and Appeal Counsel, filed by Gregory Linson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JCH)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to State of Mississippi served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/14/2019; Unknown Taylor served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (JCH)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered that the Respondent, through Jim Hood, file an answer or other responsive pleading within 20 days of the service upon said Jim Hood of this order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/19/19. (JCH)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Response to Order (Signed Petition) re #5 ORDER filed by Gregory Linson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Ordered that the Clerk of Court shall mail Petitioner a copy of the Amended Petition #4 along with a copy of this order. Ordered that Petitioner shall place his signature on page 15 of the Amended Petition #4 and return to court on or before March 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/5/19. (JCH)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 **UNSIGNED** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gregory Linson. (Attachments: #1 - Undescribed Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(JCH)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE ON PROPER FORM: Ordered that the Clerk mail to the Petitioner the form used to file a Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2254. Ordered that on or before February 5, 2019, Petitioner shall complete the attached form. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/14/2019. (JCH)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory Linson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 **UNSIGNED**PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gregory Linson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit - Undescribed Exhibits, #3 Notice of Assignment)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linson v. State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Linson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Taylor
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?