La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC v. Pineda et al

Plaintiff: La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Ramon Pineda, La Michoacana Grocery LLC, Rene Pineda and La Michoacana Supermarket, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00039
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Louis Guirola
1 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. La Michoacana Grocery LLC answer due 4/4/2019; La Michoacana Supermarket, LLC answer due 4/4/2019; Ramon Pineda answer due 4/4/2019; Rene Pineda answer due 4/4/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on March 20, 2019 (King, Steve)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Second Motion) by La Michoacana Grocery LLC, La Michoacana Supermarket, LLC, Ramon Pineda, Rene Pineda (Twiford, H.)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. La Michoacana Grocery LLC answer due 3/21/2019; La Michoacana Supermarket, LLC answer due 3/21/2019; Ramon Pineda answer due 3/21/2019; Rene Pineda answer due 3/21/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on March 6, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by La Michoacana Grocery LLC, La Michoacana Supermarket, LLC, Ramon Pineda, Rene Pineda (Twiford, H.)
February 28, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4,5,6,7. Counsel should have filed the original summons returns. The front page of these returns is a copy of the ones issued on 2/7/2019. Counsel does not need to re-file. (wld)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC. Rene Pineda served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Rayner, W.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC. Ramon Pineda served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Rayner, W.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC. La Michoacana Grocery LLC served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Rayner, W.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC. La Michoacana Supermarket, LLC served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Rayner, W.)
February 7, 2019 Summons mailed to W. Whitaker Rayner at address on docket. (wld)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAILING of Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark re #1 Complaint. (wld)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to La Michoacana Grocery LLC, La Michoacana Supermarket, LLC, Ramon Pineda, Rene Pineda. (wld)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against La Michoacana Grocery LLC, La Michoacana Supermarket, LLC, Ramon Pineda, Rene Pineda ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3912090), filed by La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1-Service Mark, #2 Exhibit A2-Trademark, #3 Exhibit A3-Trademark, #4 Exhibit A4-Trademark, #5 Exhibit A5-Trademark, #6 Exhibit A6-Trademark, #7 Exhibit A7-Trademark, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC v. Pineda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Pineda
Represented By: H. Hunter Twiford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Michoacana Grocery LLC
Represented By: H. Hunter Twiford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Pineda
Represented By: H. Hunter Twiford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Michoacana Supermarket, LLC
Represented By: H. Hunter Twiford, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Michoacana Meat Market TM Holdings, LLC
Represented By: W. Whitaker Rayner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?