Perkins v. Hutchenson et al
Plaintiff: Melvin L. Perkins
Defendant: Unknown Hutchenson, Unknown McKinsley, Elvin Wittaker, Unknown White Officer and C.I.D. Investigations
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00081
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO ADD C.I.D. INVESTIGATIONS AS A DEFENDANT Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/22/2019 (wld)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/22/2019 (wld)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for jury trial Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/22/2019 (wld)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #6 Motion ; granting #7 Motion ; granting #9 Motion ; granting #10 Motion. Motions are construed as Motions to Amend and granted. Motions 5,6,7,9 and 10 are construed as Amended Complaints and therefore the filing of a separate Amended Complaint is not necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/22/2019 (wld)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/19/19 (PKS)
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138. Acknowledgement filed by Melvin L. Perkins. (PKS)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Clerk file as of today's date a copy of page 3 of Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #8 as his Acknowledgment of Receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/19/19 (PKS)
April 19, 2019 Mailed #13 Order and #15 Order Setting Payment Schedule to plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. Clerk has mailed a copy of #15 Order to Premier Supply Link for MDOC Inmate Accounts, P.O. Box 97538, Pearl, MS 39288 per order. (PKS)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Jury Trial by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION on Officer Elvin Whittaker making threats before trial or court hearing by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to File Lawsuit for Retaliation by Melvin L. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 - Undescribed Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(JCH)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Melvin L. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to File 2 Officers Assaulted and No Medical Attention was Received by Melvin L. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Add CID to Civil Suit for Not Investigating a Felony Crime by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Melvin L. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 2/25/19. (JCH)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 2/25/19. (JCH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 **UNSIGNED** *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Melvin L. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Hutchenson, Unknown McKinsley, Unknown White Officer, Elvin Wittaker, filed by Melvin L. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Hutchenson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hutchenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McKinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elvin Wittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown White Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.I.D. Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin L. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?