Jackson v. M & D Construction Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Aaron L. Jackson
Defendant: M & D Construction Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00109
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2019 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor M. Lawrence on behalf of M & D Construction Co., Inc. (Lawrence, Taylor)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by M & D Construction Co., Inc..(Lawrence, Taylor)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron L. Jackson. (Dillard, Joel)
April 1, 2019 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #3. A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (wld)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron L. Jackson. M & D Construction Co., Inc. served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Dillard, Joel)
February 27, 2019 Summons issued and mailed to Joel F. Dillard at address on docket. (wld)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to M & D Construction Co., Inc. (wld)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against M & D Construction Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3927406), filed by Aaron L. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. M & D Construction Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & D Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Taylor M. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron L. Jackson
Represented By: Joel F. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?