Perkins v. Lampely

Plaintiff: Melvin L. Perkins
Defendant: Ronnie Lampely and Ronnie Lampley
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00229
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Melvin L. Perkins regarding jail conditions. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (PKS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melvin L. Perkins: WCCF, U.S. Hwy 61 N., Woodville, MS 39669 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Show I'm in a Life Threatening Situation by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wld)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 filed by Melvin L. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 5/9/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/9/2019 (wld)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Melvin L. Perkins (wld)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronnie Lampely, filed by Melvin L. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2019: #2 Notice of Assignment) (wld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Lampely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Lampely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Lampley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin L. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?