Corso et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michael Corso and Dana Corso
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00230
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Disclosure by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Gunn, Ashley)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric Graham,M.D. by Dana Corso, Michael Corso (LoCoco, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Subpoena)(Gunn, Ashley)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Subpoena)(Gunn, Ashley)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Gunn, Ashley)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Gunn, Ashley)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set during a three-week term of Court beginning on 9/8/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 8/26-27/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 7/10/2019. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 7/10/2019. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 8/15/2019. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/25/2019. Motions due by 3/23/2020. Settlement Conference set for 5/26/2020 01:30 PM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) Walker before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. ADR Report due by 8/19/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/26/2020. EDT: 3 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/6/2019 (SR)
June 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/6/2019 with attorneys Joseph A. LoCoco and Ashley W. Gunn. (SR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Dana Corso, Michael Corso (LoCoco, Joseph)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Gunn, Ashley)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2019 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley W. Gunn on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Gunn, Ashley)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Radicioni, Cory)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Radicioni, Cory)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Mississippi, case number 30CI1:19cv48RK. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14643011244) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certified State Court File, #2 Exhibit B-Unsigned Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit C-Allstate Declaration Page, #4 Exhibit D-Letter to Cory Radicioni from Joseph A. LoCoco, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corso et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley W. Gunn
Represented By: Cory L. Radicioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Corso
Represented By: Joseph A. LoCoco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Corso
Represented By: Joseph A. LoCoco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?