Kuns v. Waste Pro of Mississippi, Inc.

Plaintiff: Charolette R. Kuns
Defendant: Waste Pro of Mississippi, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00234
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
April 27, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Waste Pro of Mississippi, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Waste Pro USA, Inc. for Waste Pro of Mississippi, Inc.. (Hodges, Melissa)
April 23, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: Incorrect event chosen. This matter was removed from state court, therefore the event code, Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) should have been used. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Waste Pro of Mississippi, Inc..(Hodges, Melissa)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is April 22, 2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/18/2019 (AG)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Waste Pro of Mississippi, Inc. (Hodges, Melissa)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Waste Pro of Mississippi, Inc. from Circuit Court of Harrison Co., MS, 1st Jud. Dist., case number A2401-19-47, with jury demand in lower court. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-3962901) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Harrison County Civil Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Motion for Payment of Cost of Personal Service, #5 Exhibit E - Summons Returned Executed, #6 Exhibit F -State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuns v. Waste Pro of Mississippi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charolette R. Kuns
Represented By: John Paul Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Pro of Mississippi, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?