In Re: Friede Goldman Halter Inc., et al.
Debtor In Possession: Friede Goldman Halter, Inc. and The Consolidated FGH Liquidating Trust
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Trinity Industries, Inc.
Appellee: Kathleen A. Uzee, Philip A. Uzee, Carroll Hollingshead and Forrest Lewis, Jr.
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Gulfport
Case Number: 1:2019cv00266
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Omar J. Alaniz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Trinity Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment TX State Bar Certificate, #2 Attachment TX Supreme Court Letter)(Wilson, Sarah)
July 3, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Omar J. Alaniz receipt number 0538-4029157 $ 100 (Wilson, Sarah)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shauncey Hunter Ridgeway on behalf of Trinity Industries, Inc. (Ridgeway, Shauncey)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony J. Lucisano; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Mark Little. Anthony J. Lucisano and J. Mark Little are admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Appellant Trinity Industries, Inc. in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 6/28/2019 (AB)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting as unopposed Appellant Trinity Industries, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time #3 to file an appellant brief and additional time for Appellees to file a responsive brief. Appellants brief is due on or before Friday, July 26, 2019, and Appellees response is due on or before Thursday, August 29, 2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE REGARDING THIS MOTION. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on June 28, 2019. (BGL)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for J. Mark Little to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Trinity Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment TX Supreme Court Good Standing, #2 Attachment TX State Bar Good Standing)(Wilson, Sarah)
June 27, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for J. Mark Little receipt number 0538-4024126 $ 100 (Wilson, Sarah)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Anthony J. Lucisano to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Trinity Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment TX Supreme Court Good Standing, #2 Attachment TX State Bar Good Standing)(Wilson, Sarah)
June 27, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Anthony J. Lucisano receipt number 0538-4023812 $ 100 (Wilson, Sarah)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Extend Appellant's Brief & Appellee's Brief Deadline by Trinity Industries, Inc. (Wilson, Sarah)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Record for Bankruptcy by U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Gulfport (Attachments: #1 Item 1, #2 Item 2 Part 2-1, #3 Item 2 Part 2-2, #4 Item 2 Part 2-3, #5 Item 2 Part 3, #6 Item 2 Part 4, #7 Item 2 Part 5, #8 Item 3, #9 Item 4, #10 U.S. Bankruptcy Cover Letter)(PKS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 01-52173KMS file received. The docketing of the record on appeal by USDC starts the briefing schedule. Attorneys should refer to Bankruptcy Rule 8018 for all briefing schedules. Notice of Appeal filed by Trinity Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal, #2 Transmittal Cover Letter, #3 USBC Docket Sheet)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Friede Goldman Halter Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: Friede Goldman Halter, Inc.
Represented By: John G. Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: The Consolidated FGH Liquidating Trust
Represented By: John G. Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Trinity Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Wilson
Represented By: J. Mark Little - PHV
Represented By: Shauncey Hunter Ridgeway
Represented By: Anthony J. Lucisano - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kathleen A. Uzee
Represented By: William P. Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Philip A. Uzee
Represented By: William P. Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carroll Hollingshead
Represented By: William P. Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Forrest Lewis, Jr.
Represented By: William P. Wessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Gulfport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?