Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Wendy M. Jackson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00274
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Wendy M. Jackson. Service made upon: U S Attorney General; (Thomas, Ashley)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Wendy M. Jackson. Service made upon: Commissioner of SSA. (Thomas, Ashley)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Wendy M. Jackson. Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney; (Thomas, Ashley)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (JCH)
May 24, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 14643011366 (RLW)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 5/223/19 (Lewis, Nijah)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time to pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 5/21/19 (CCO)
May 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2019. Participants: Noel Black and Wendy Jackson. The Court heard additional testimony regarding Plaintiff's motion for IFP. Order forthcoming. (Lewis, Nijah)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CALENDAR SETTING: Telephone Conference set for 5/21/2019, 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wendy M. Jackson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call with Plaintiff, and once all parties are on the line, counsel should contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (CCO)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wendy M. Jackson (RLW)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Wendy M. Jackson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy M. Jackson
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?