Lett v. Errington
Plaintiff: Edwin Darrell Lett
Defendant: Joe Errington
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00280
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing fee paid for Edwin Darrell Lett: $ 5.00, receipt number 14643011360 (wld)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: on or before June 13, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application OR pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 5/14/2019 (wld)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Edwin Darrell Lett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Supreme Court Order, #2 Exhibit B-Final Judgment in 1:15cv309LGFKB, #3 Exhibit C-Supreme Court Order, #4 Exhibit D-Supreme Court Letter re: Petition for Writ of Certiorari, #5 Exhibit E-USCA Order, #6 Exhibit F-Circuit Court Indictment, #7 Exhibit G-Circuit Court Jury Instruction, #8 Envelope)(wld)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by Edwin Darrell Lett (wld)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edwin Darrell Lett. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(wld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019: #3 Notice of Assignment) (wld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lett v. Errington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Darrell Lett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Errington
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?