Knowles Construction, Inc. v. Stuart & Company General Contractors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Knowles Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company and Stuart & Company General Contractors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00317
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company answer due 7/31/2019; Stuart & Company General Contractors, LLC answer due 7/31/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 24, 2019 (King, Steve)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stuart & Company General Contractors, LLC (Hatten, W.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hatten, W.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Stuart & Company General Contractors, LLC from Harrison County Circuit Court - First Judicial District, case number A2401-19-119. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 14643011425) Lower court jury demand. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 - Lower Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles Construction, Inc. v. Stuart & Company General Contractors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knowles Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Austin Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Represented By: W. Edward Hatten, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart & Company General Contractors, LLC
Represented By: W. Edward Hatten, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?