Skinner v. GPCH-GP, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jesse Manuel Skinner
Defendant: William E. Whitfield, III and GPCH-GP, Inc.
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00319
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Saucier Rosetti on behalf of GPCH-GP, Inc., William E. Whitfield, III (Rosetti, Kimberly)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Whitfield, III on behalf of GPCH-GP, Inc., William E. Whitfield, III (Whitfield, William)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 7/30/19. (JCH)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jesse Manuel Skinner. GPCH-GP, Inc. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Jesse Skinner re Waiver of the Service of Summons signed by Attorney Whitfield on behalf of GPCH-GP, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter from Attorney Whitfield) (RLW) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #2 Envelope) (RLW).
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 filed by Jesse Manuel Skinner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 7/18/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 6/18/2019 (wld)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jesse Manuel Skinner (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wld)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against GPCH-GP, Inc., William E. Whitfield, III, filed by Jesse Manuel Skinner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letter to Jesse M. Skinner, #2 Exhibit B-Letter to William E. Whitfield, III, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope, #5 Notice of Assignment)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skinner v. GPCH-GP, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Whitfield, III
Represented By: William E. Whitfield, III
Represented By: Kimberly Saucier Rosetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPCH-GP, Inc.
Represented By: William E. Whitfield, III
Represented By: Kimberly Saucier Rosetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Manuel Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?