D.R. Horton, Inc. et al v. Canal Indemnity Insurance
Plaintiff: D.R. Horton, Inc.-Gulf Coast, D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham and D.R. Horton, Inc.
Defendant: Canal Indemnity Insurance
Case Number: 1:2019cv00329
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re Defendant's #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response is due by 8/21/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 7/31/2019 (MG)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss by D.R. Horton, Inc., D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham, D.R. Horton, Inc.-Gulf Coast (Sullivan, Nicole)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Canal Indemnity Insurance (Morgan, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Canal Indemnity Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Morgan, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendant shall have until 7/17/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on June 24, 2019 (King, Steve)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Canal Indemnity Insurance (Morgan, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Canal Indemnity Insurance identifying Corporate Parent Canal Insurance Company for Canal Indemnity Insurance. (Morgan, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Canal Indemnity Insurance from Circuit Court of Harrison County, Mississippi, case number 24C12:19cv68. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4015951) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.R. Horton, Inc. et al v. Canal Indemnity Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.R. Horton, Inc.-Gulf Coast
Represented By: Nicole W. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.R. Horton, Inc.-Birmingham
Represented By: Nicole W. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.R. Horton, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole W. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canal Indemnity Insurance
Represented By: Robert Douglas Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?