Perkins v. Henry
Plaintiff: Melvin L. Perkins
Defendant: Unknown Henry
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00334
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Unknown Henry on 8/6/19. Waiver of Service due by 9/4/2019. (RLW)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for Defendant Unknown Henry, Officer. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/6/19 (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons Form, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons Form) (RLW)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/6/19. (RLW)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 Response to Order re #15 ORDER, filed by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 APR Request, #2 Envelope) (RLW)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: That on or before 8/12/19, Plaintiff must file a written response to this Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/19/19. (RLW)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for a Jury Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/19/19. (RLW)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; *RESTRICTED* granting #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Clerk is directed to mail copies of this order to Plaintiff and to Premier Supply Link for MDOC Inmate Accounts, P.O. Box 97538, Pearl, Mississippi 39288. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/19/19. (RLW)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #2 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for a Jury Trial by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #2 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Melvin L. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Notice of Assignment and NEF re #1 Complaint. Mail sent to Melvin L. Perkins. (Notice of Assignment and NEF were re-mailed to Plaintiff at his new address) (RLW)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Ordered that Clerk mail to Plaintiff at his address provided in his Notice of Change of Address #4 filed 6/27/19, a copy of the Courts [2, 3] Orders, and that Plaintiff comply with the [2, 3] Orders entered 6/24/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/28/19. (RLW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melvin L. Perkins: # 43166, WCCF, P.O. Box 1889, Woodville, MS 39669. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCH)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER The plaintiff shall file within 30 days of the date of this order a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/24/19. (JCH)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/24/19. (JCH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Henry filed by Melvin L. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin L. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?