Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC v. McCarty et al
Plaintiff: Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC
Defendant: Terry L. Peterson, Justin Storer, Harry O. Ridgdell, Justin Higgins, Robert Barnett, Garlon M. McCarty, Mitchell Jones, Zackery Storer, John Does #1-10 and Andrew J. Russell
Case Number: 1:2019cv00336
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC by Harry O. Ridgdell, Mitchell Jones, Justin Storer, Justin Higgins, Zackery Storer, Robert Barnett.(Hodges, Melissa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by Andrew J. Russell.(Hodges, Melissa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 35 TRIAL BRIEF by Robert Barnett, Justin Higgins, Mitchell Jones, Garlon M. McCarty, Harry O. Ridgdell, Andrew J. Russell, Justin Storer, Zackery Storer (Hodges, Melissa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 34 TRIAL BRIEF by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Anzenberger, Timothy)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Harry O. Ridgdell answer due 8/16/2019; Justin Storer answer due 8/16/2019; Zackery Storer answer due 8/16/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 12, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
August 9, 2019 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint, by Harry O. Ridgdell, Justin Storer, Zackery Storer (Hodges, Melissa)
August 9, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment and Damages against Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC by Garlon M. McCarty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement)(Hodges, Melissa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TRO Proceedings held on 07/26/2019 before Judge Louis Guirola. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherri Penny, Telephone Number : 228-563-1751. NOTICE RE : REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no Notice is filed, the transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on the court website at www.mssd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2019. (SLP)
July 26, 2019 Filing 30 Witness List as to hearing held on 7/26/2019. (VLK)
July 26, 2019 Filing 29 HEARING EXHIBIT - DEFENDANTS: Defendants' Exhibit admitted during hearing held on 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 D-1)(VLK)
July 26, 2019 Filing 28 HEARING EXHIBIT - PLAINTIFF: Plaintiff's Exhibits admitted during Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 P-1, #2 P-2, #3 P-3 (Part 1), #4 P-3 (Part 2), #5 P-3 (Part 3), #6 P-4, #7 P-5, #8 P-6, #9 P-7)(VLK)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER. The parties may submit closing briefs within seven days after the transcript of the hearing is available. Until the Court enters an order resolving the request for injunctive relief, the Court's earlier Order requiring the parties to maintain the status quo remains in full force and effect. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 7/26/19 (Whitsitt, K)
July 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2019 regarding #14 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC. Oral arguments were held as to the motion on 7/26/2019. Parties are to present their briefs seven days after the hearing transcripts are available. Parties are advised that the prior Order #12 to maintain Status Quo remains in effect. APPEARANCES: T. Armer, J. Heidelberg and T. Anzenberger, Attorneys for Plaintiff; and Melissa Hodges, Attorney for Defendants. Court Reporter Sherri Penny, Telephone Number: 228-563-1751. (VLK)
July 25, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert Barnett, Justin Higgins, John Does #1-10, Mitchell Jones, Garlon M. McCarty, Harry O. Ridgdell, Andrew J. Russell, Justin Storer, Zackery Storer (Hodges, Melissa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Receipt of Deposition of Breanna Guy-Irby by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Deposition Cover Sheet)(Armer, Tristan)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #25 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Garlon M. McCarty answer due 8/9/2019; Harry O. Ridgdell answer due 8/9/2019; Justin Storer answer due 8/9/2019; Zackery Storer answer due 8/9/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on July 17, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
July 16, 2019 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint, by Garlon M. McCarty, Harry O. Ridgdell, Justin Storer, Zackery Storer (Hodges, Melissa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE to Take Deposition of BREANNA GUY-IRBY by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Armer, Tristan)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 Motion Leave to Take Deposition Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 07/15/2019 (Guirola, Louis)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF BREANNA GUY-IRBY filed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - Emails regarding Affidavit)(Armer, Tristan)
July 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #21: L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to include an exhibit letter or number on the document and in docket text for future filings. (PKS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF BREANNA GUY-IRBY filed by Garlon M. McCarty, Harry O. Ridgdell, Justin Storer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails Between Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - Emails Between Counsel)(Hodges, Melissa)
July 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Harry O. Ridgdell answer due 7/18/2019; Justin Storer answer due 7/17/2019; Zackery Storer answer due 7/17/2019. (RLW)
July 10, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #17, #19 and #20: Advising attorney that the service date of 6/25/19 in the docket entry is incorrect, therefore the answer due date is incorrect. Attorney is not required to re-file. Court staff will reset due dates. (RLW)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC. Zackery Storer served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Armer, Tristan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC. Justin Storer served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Armer, Tristan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC. Garlon M. McCarty served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Armer, Tristan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC. Harry O. Ridgdell served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Armer, Tristan)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER setting expedited briefing schedule re Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Breanna Guy-Irby. Defendants' response is due by close of business on Thursday, July 11, 2019. Any reply is due Friday, July 12, 2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 7/9/2019 (MG)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF BREANNA GUY-IRBY by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Subpoena to Appear and Testify upon Breanna Guy-Irby, #2 Exhibit B- July 2, 2019 Email from Court with Hearing Dates, #3 Exhibit C- July 2, 2019 Email from Plaintiff accepting Hearing Date, #4 Exhibit D- July 2, 2019 Email from Amanda Cange cease contact with Client, #5 Exhibit E- Emails requesting Deposition of Breanna Guy-Irby)(Armer, Tristan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Anzenberger, Timothy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Agreements, #2 Exhibit "B" - Sign In, #3 Exhibit "C" - Lawson Affidavit)(Anzenberger, Timothy)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. (VLK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Barnett, Justin Higgins, John Does #1-10, Mitchell Jones, Garlon M. McCarty, Harry O. Ridgdell, Justin Storer, Zackery Storer, Andrew J. Russell, filed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Agreements, #2 Exhibit "B" - Sign In, #3 Exhibit "C" - Lawson Affidavit)(Anzenberger, Timothy)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue and Requiring the Parties to preserve the Status Quo Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 06/29/2019 (Guirola, Louis)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, currently set for July 3, 2019 filed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Anzenberger, Timothy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, currently set for July 3, 2019 by Robert Barnett, Justin Higgins, Mitchell Jones, Garlon M. McCarty, Terry L. Peterson, Harry O. Ridgdell, Justin Storer, Zackery Storer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email to Chambers, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff)(Hodges, Melissa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Kimberly Hodges on behalf of All Defendants (Hodges, Melissa)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA TO APPEAR AND TESTIFY TO BREANNA GUY-IRBY by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Subpoena to Breanna Guy-Irby)(Armer, Tristan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Anzenberger on behalf of Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Anzenberger, Timothy)
June 25, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 and #4: Attorney is advised to include the case number and judge assignment of 1:19cv336LG-RHW on future filed pleadings. ADDITIONAL DOCKET ANNOTATION #3 and #4: Exhibit numbers or letters should be included on the document and in docket text with description of exhibits. Attorney is advised to follow these procedures for future filings. (PKS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction (Heidelberg, James)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 6/24/19. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. (Whitsitt, K)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tristan Russell Armer on behalf of Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Armer, Tristan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction filed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit McCarty Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit Sign In sheet of June 17, 2019)(Heidelberg, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit McCarty Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit Higgins Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ridgdell Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit Peterson Employment Agreement, #5 Exhibit Jones Employment Agreement, #6 Exhibit JStorer Employment Agreement, #7 Exhibit ZStorer Employment Agreement, #8 Exhibit Barnett Employment Agreement, #9 Exhibit Affidavit - Lawson)(Heidelberg, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robert Barnett, Justin Higgins, Mitchell Jones, Garlon M. McCarty, Terry L. Peterson, Harry O. Ridgdell, Justin Storer, Zackery Storer. (PKS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Barnett, Justin Higgins, John Does #1-10, Mitchell Jones, Garlon M. McCarty, Terry L. Peterson, Harry O. Ridgdell, Justin Storer, Zackery Storer (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4018858) filed by Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard Lawson, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC v. McCarty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Peterson
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Storer
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry O. Ridgdell
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Higgins
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Barnett
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlon M. McCarty
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Jones
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zackery Storer
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-10
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Russell
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hydroprocessing Associates, LLC
Represented By: James H. Heidelberg
Represented By: Tristan Russell Armer
Represented By: Timothy J. Anzenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?