Chevron U.S.A., Inc. v. Matthews
Plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Ted Matthews and Darin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00353
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. Ted Matthews served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Bentley, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ted Matthews.(Corlew, J. Scott)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. (Bentley, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Issued summons mailed to attorney at address listed on docket/summons. (JCH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ted Matthews. (JCH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ted Matthews (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4025596), filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. Jury trial requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevron U.S.A., Inc. v. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Matthews
Represented By: J. Scott Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin
Represented By: J. Scott Corlew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?