Pettis v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Sammie Henry Pettis
Defendant: Joe Arrington, Andrew Mills and Pelicia Hall
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00355
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Ordered that Plaintiff shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than 9/12/19. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/29/19. (RLW)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Clerk is directed to mail copies of this order to the Plaintiff and Premier Supply Link for MDOC Inmate Accounts, Post Office Box 97538, Pearl, Mississippi 39288. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 8/29/19. (RLW)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Sammie Henry Pettis (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/3/19. (RLW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Sammie Henry Pettis (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Arrington, Pelicia Hall, Andrew Mills, filed by Sammie Henry Pettis (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pettis v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammie Henry Pettis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?