Rankins v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Booker Terrell Rankins, II
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00484
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Albertus F. Wiesedeppe, III shall be admitted pro hac vice to serve as co-counsel for the plaintiff Booker Terrell Rankins, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 16, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Albertus F. Wiesedeppe, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4088515) by Booker Terrell Rankins, II (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Nicks, Shantrell)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY; Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY; Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY; Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY; Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY and Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY terminated. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on August 26, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Rush on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Rush, Clare)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Letter sent to Haycraft, Hodges, Lucier, McEldowney, Reid, Seiler and Nations on 8/16/19 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (RLW)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01690. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Mississippi. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/11/2019. (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER)(blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/13/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/13/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than July 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to showcause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/4/19. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/13/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/13/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/13/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/13/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7444798) filed by Booker Terrell Rankins, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Booker Terrell Rankins, II(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rankins v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Booker Terrell Rankins, II
Represented By: Howard L. Nations - PHV
Represented By: Shantrell H. Nicks
Represented By: Albertus F. Wiesedeppe - PHV, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Rush
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Rush
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?