Collins v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dorothy C. Collins
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00513
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Attorneys Downs and Nelson are ordered to either move to withdraw or seek pro hac vice admission, on or before October 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/26/19 (HM)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion by Defendants BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record. Kevin M. Hodges of the law firm Williams & Connolly, LLP, Catherine Pyune McEldowney of the law firm Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy LLC, Don Keller Haycraft, Devin C. Reid, and Scott C. Seiler of the law firm Liskow & Lewis; and Georgia Lee Lucier of the law firm Hunton Andrews Kurth, LLP are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for these Defendants and terminated from the docket. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/16/19 (HM)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 Letter sent to Haycraft, Hodges, Lucier, McEldowney, Reid, Seiler, Downs and Nelson on 8/26/2019 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (JCH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Rush on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Rush, Clare)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan))
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00468. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/14/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/14/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/14/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 30, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/2/2019.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/14/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/14/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/14/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/14/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7377102) filed by Dorothy C. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Affidavit)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Dorothy C. Collins(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy C. Collins
Represented By: Craig Downs
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Rush
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Clare Smith Rush
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Thomas W. Tardy, III
Represented By: Charles (Chan) E. McLeod
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?