Kirkland v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Mann Kirkland, III
Defendant: BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00528
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01323. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/16/2019.(pp) (NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than July 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to showcause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/4/19.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/19/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7425444) filed by Robert Mann Kirkland, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Robert Mann Kirkland, III(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkland v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mann Kirkland, III
Represented By: Howard L. Nations - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?