Elly v. Books-A-Million, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hope Elly
Defendant: Books-A-Million, Inc., Gulfport Great Southern Properties, L.L.C. and American National Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00555
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Benito Hernandez on behalf of Books-A-Million, Inc. (Hernandez, Juan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint by Books-A-Million, Inc. (Hall, Jennifer)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion to Extend Answer Deadline. Defendant Books-A-Million, Inc. is granted an extension of time up to and including November 15, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/25/19 (HM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly. Books-A-Million, Inc. served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Barrett, Pshon)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hope Elly. American National Insurance Company served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Barrett, Pshon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American National Insurance Company, Books-A-Million, Inc. (wld)
September 16, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: Attorney is advised that the summonses should not have been attached as exhibits. Attorney is advised to mail the original and one copy of the summons per defendant and a self addressed stamped envelope to the clerk's office. The summonses will be issued and mailed to you for service. (RLW)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Books-A-Million, Inc., American National Insurance Company, filed by Hope Elly. (Attachments: #1 Summons American National Insurance, #2 Summons Books-A-Million)(McAdory, Bradley)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hope Elly (McAdory, Bradley)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Books-A-Million, Inc., Gulfport Great Southern Properties, L.L.C. (RLW)
September 4, 2019 Remark: Original issued summons were mailed to attorney at address on summons. (RLW)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Books-A-Million, Inc., Gulfport Great Southern Properties, L.L.C. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4079329), filed by Hope Elly (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elly v. Books-A-Million, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Books-A-Million, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Graham Hall
Represented By: Juan Benito Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfport Great Southern Properties, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Elly
Represented By: Pshon Barrett
Represented By: Bradley Davis McAdory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?