Fogleman v. Bayside Chrysler Dodge Jeep et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Shane Fogleman
Defendant: John Does I-X and Bayside Chrysler Dodge Jeep
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00559
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bayside Chrysler Dodge Jeep. Bayside Chrysler Dodge Jeep waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Van Camp, Katie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bayside Chrysler Dodge Jeep on 10/4/2019. Waiver of Service due by 11/4/2019 (wld)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Clerk to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons for Defendant Bayside Chrysler Dodge Jeep. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons Form, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons Form)(wld)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/3/2019 (wld)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 Acknowledgement filed by Jeremy Shane Fogleman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wld)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 9/6/19. (RLW)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeremy Shane Fogleman (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (RLW)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bayside Chrysler Dodge Jeep, John Does I-X, filed by Jeremy Shane Fogleman (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fogleman v. Bayside Chrysler Dodge Jeep et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Shane Fogleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayside Chrysler Dodge Jeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?