Staten v. Harrison County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Ursula C. Staten
Defendant: Harrison County, Mississippi, Health Assurance, LLC, Kenissa Clark, Robert H. Pedersen, Harrison County Board of Supervisors, Haley Necaise Broom, Jason E. Dare, Melvin Brisolara, Lisa M. Ross Law Firm, John Does 1-5, Walter T. Johnson, Patrick T. Guild and Lisa Mishune Ross
Case Number: 1:2019cv00560
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Recusal filed by Ursula C. Staten (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(wld)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Recusal by Ursula C. Staten (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(wld)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Reassign Case. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 10/3/2019 (wld)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER *RESTRICTED* finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The docket reflects that Plaintiff has paid the filing fee. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 26, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Melvin Brisolara, Haley Necaise Broom, Kenissa Clark, Jason E. Dare, Patrick T. Guild, Harrison County Board of Supervisors, Harrison County, Mississippi, Health Assurance, LLC, Walter T. Johnson, Lisa M. Ross Law Firm, Robert H. Pedersen, Lisa Mishune Ross. (wld)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint by Ursula C. Staten (wld)
September 25, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 14643011708 (JCH)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Reassign Case by Ursula C. Staten (JCH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ursula C. Staten (JCH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Melvin Brisolara, Haley Necaise Broom, Kenissa Clark, Jason E. Dare, Patrick T. Guild, Harrison County Board of Supervisors, Harrison County, Mississippi, Health Assurance, LLC, John Does 1-5, Walter T. Johnson, Lisa M. Ross Law Firm, Robert H. Pedersen, Lisa Mishune Ross, filed by Ursula C. Staten. Jury trial requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-30, #3 Exhibit 31-60, #4 Exhibit 61-90, #5 Exhibit 91-99, #6 Exhibit 100-114, #7 Notice of Assignment)(JCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staten v. Harrison County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Assurance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenissa Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley Necaise Broom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason E. Dare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Brisolara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M. Ross Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter T. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick T. Guild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Mishune Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula C. Staten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?