Harris v. SNL Distribution Services Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Wendell Harris
Defendant: James T. Windham and SNL Distribution Services Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00562
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Burruss Riis. J. Burruss Riis is admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/22/2019 (AB)
October 21, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 and #8: Advising attorney that the COGS should have been attached as an exhibit and not scanned in with the main document. Attorney is not required to re-file. (RLW)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for J. Burruss Riis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SNL Distribution Services Corp., James T. Windham (Hassell, Katie)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for J. Burruss Riis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4118311) by SNL Distribution Services Corp., James T. Windham (Hassell, Katie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Core Disclosure by Wendell Harris (Altman, Kenneth)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by SNL Distribution Services Corp., James T. Windham (Spann, Catherine)
September 10, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment of HSO-JCG on future filed pleadings. (RLW)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Hammett Hassell on behalf of SNL Distribution Services Corp., James T. Windham (Hassell, Katie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SNL Distribution Services Corp. identifying Corporate Parent SNL Distribution Services Corp., Corporate Parent Paladin Capital, Inc. for SNL Distribution Services Corp.. (Spann, Catherine)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SNL Distribution Services Corp., James T. Windham from Circuit Court of Harrison Co., MS, 1st Jud. Dist., case number A2401-19-183, with jury demand in lower court. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0538-4082408) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process Receipts, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of David E. Smith, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. SNL Distribution Services Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Windham
Represented By: Catherine S. Spann
Represented By: Katie Hammett Hassell
Represented By: J. Burruss Riis - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNL Distribution Services Corp.
Represented By: Catherine S. Spann
Represented By: Katie Hammett Hassell
Represented By: J. Burruss Riis - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Harris
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?