Byrd v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Britney Ann Byrd
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00574
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER *RESTRICTED* overruling Plaintiff's Objections #5 , Adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation #4 , and Denying Plaintiff's Motion #2 for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on November 6, 2019. (AW)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations filed by Britney Ann Byrd (RLW)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denial of #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 30, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER establishing schedule and requirements for briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 17, 2019. (Joffe, Scherry) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/17/2019) (RLW).
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (RLW)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Britney Ann Byrd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Various Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Assignment) (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britney Ann Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?