Denny et al v. Ocean Marine Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Denny and Kyle Denny
Defendant: Kevin McLaughlin, Don Weston, Ocean Marine Group, Inc. and Michael Keith King
Case Number: 1:2019cv00629
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Denny, Courtney Denny. Don Weston served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (Holt, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Denny, Courtney Denny. Kevin McLaughlin served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (Holt, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Denny, Courtney Denny. Ocean Marine Group, Inc. served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (Holt, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Denny, Courtney Denny. Michael Keith King served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (Holt, Christopher)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Kevin McLaughlin.(Wilkinson, Robert)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michael Keith King, Kevin McLaughlin, Don Weston. (wld)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Michael Keith King, Kevin McLaughlin, Ocean Marine Group, Inc., Don Weston ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14643011695), filed by Kyle Denny, Courtney Denny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Buyers Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denny et al v. Ocean Marine Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McLaughlin
Represented By: Robert W. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Marine Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Keith King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Denny
Represented By: Reed S. Bennett
Represented By: Christopher G. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Denny
Represented By: Reed S. Bennett
Represented By: Christopher G. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?